Wilson v. Gralewski et al
Plaintiff: Kyia C. Wilson
Defendant: Ashlee Ann Gralewski, Melissa S. Loftland, Division of Family & Children Services of Hall County Georgia, Hall County Georgia Police Department, State of Georgia, State of Delaware, Cynthia A. Susi, Judge Paula T. Ryan and Hall County Georgia District Attorneys Office
Case Number: 2:2022cv00075
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Gainesville Office
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 12 AMENDED MOTION to Change Venue by Kyia C. Wilson. (rsg)
May 25, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing this action without prejudice as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). (rsg)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
May 25, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kyia C. Wilson re #10 Order on Motions, #11 Clerk's Judgment. (rsg)
May 25, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (rsg)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court also dismisses as moot #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #4 Motion to Expedited Hearing and #5 Motion to Vacate, Motion for temporary custody and Motion for a Forensic Audit. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. Because Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order. If Plaintiff files such an amended complaint in the time allowed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reopen the case and resubmit the matter to the Court for a frivolity review. The Court warns Plaintiff that a failure to correct the deficiencies identified in this Order may result in a dismissal of claims with prejudice. See Bryant v. Dupree, 252 F.3d 1161,1163 (llth Cir. 2001). Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 05/24/2022. (rsg)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:22-CV-075-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 04/18/2022. (ddm)
April 18, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kyia C. Wilson re #9 Order. (ddm)
April 18, 2022 Submission of #5 MOTION to Vacate, MOTION for temporary custody, MOTION for forensic audit, #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #4 MOTION for Expedited Hearing, to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (ddm)
April 13, 2022 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 1:21-cv-01138. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the order, Wilson's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, Docket Item #2 , is granted, but this Court finds that venue over Wilson's action is not proper in the Western District of New York. In the interest of justice, this Court transfers this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). This Court does not screen the complaint, nor does it consider the merits of Wilson's remaining motions, Docket Items #3 , #4 , and #5 . The Clerk of the Court shall seal Docket Items #1 , #1 -1, and #5 . SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 4/13/2022. (EK) (Chambers has mailed a copy of the order to the pro se plaintiff.)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- [Transferred from New York Western on 4/13/2022.]
April 13, 2022 Submission of #5 MOTION to Vacate MOTION for temporary custody, #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #4 MOTION to Expedite, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (aar)
January 5, 2022 Filing 6 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint, filed by Kyia C. Wilson. (CGJ) [Transferred from New York Western on 4/13/2022.]
December 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Vacate, MOTION for temporary custody, MOTION for forensic audit by Kyia C. Wilson. (CGJ) [Transferred from New York Western on 4/13/2022.]
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for an Expedited Hearing by Kyia C. Wilson. (CGJ) [Transferred from New York Western on 4/13/2022.]
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kyia C. Wilson. (CGJ) [Transferred from New York Western on 4/13/2022.]
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kyia C. Wilson. (CGJ) [Transferred from New York Western on 4/13/2022.]
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Division of Family & Children Services of Hall County Georgia, Ashlee Ann Gralewski, Hall County Georgia Police Department, Melissa S. Loftland, State of Delaware, State of Georgia, filed by Kyia C. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (Original document maintained in case file due to poor scan legibility) (CGJ) [Transferred from New York Western on 4/13/2022.]
October 20, 2021 Remark: Plaintiff has been given a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, Pro Se Assistance Program Information and ADR Notification. (CGJ) [Transferred from New York Western on 4/13/2022.]
October 20, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ) [Transferred from New York Western on 4/13/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Gralewski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyia C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashlee Ann Gralewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa S. Loftland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division of Family & Children Services of Hall County Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall County Georgia Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia A. Susi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Paula T. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall County Georgia District Attorneys Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?