Varley v. Reynolds
Plaintiff: Kathryn Varley
Defendant: Deborah Reynolds
Case Number: 2:2022cv00204
Filed: October 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons by Deborah Reynolds. (Connelly, Eric)
December 2, 2022 Filing 10 Initial Disclosures by Deborah Reynolds.(Connelly, Eric)
December 2, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery - Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Kathryn Varley.(Champion, Darl)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER re: #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. A 6-month Discovery period ends on 6/2/2023. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/30/2022. (sk)
November 30, 2022 Filing 7 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Kathryn Varley. (McKay, Andrienne)
November 2, 2022 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Kathryn Varley. (Champion, Darl)
November 2, 2022 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Deborah Reynolds. Discovery ends on 4/3/2023.(Connelly, Eric) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Court Notice of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
October 14, 2022 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Kathryn Varley. Deborah Reynolds served on 10/13/2022, answer due 11/3/2022. (Champion, Darl)
October 13, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Deborah Reynolds. (rsg)
October 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kathryn Varley. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-12125493) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varley v. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Varley
Represented By: Andrienne K. McKay
Represented By: Darl Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Reynolds
Represented By: Eric Connelly
Represented By: Wayne Stephen Tartline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?