United States of America v. 275 Honey Lane, Fayetteville, Fayette County, Georgia et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: ONE 2013 MERCEDES-BENZ GL450, VIN 4JGDF7CE9DA255886, One 2017 Ford Explorer, VIN 1FM5K7F80HGC68616 and 275 Honey Lane, Fayetteville, Fayette County, Georgia
Case Number: 3:2019cv00007
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Freida Farley via Attorney (Brown, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to MERS, as nominee for Prime Mortgage Lending (Brown, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Myesha Johnson (Brown, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Prime Mortgage Lending (Brown, Michael)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by United States of America. 275 Honey Lane, Fayetteville, Fayette County, Georgia and Non-Party, Resident Brittany Farley, served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service - Non-Party/Resident Brittany Farley)(usw)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 4 - March 9, 2019, by Michael John Brown. (Brown, Michael)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed on 2/12/2019 for 2013 Mercedes-Benz GL450 VIN 4JGDF7CE9DA255886. (usw)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed on 2/12/2019 for 2017 Ford Explorer, VIN 1FM5K7F80HGC68616. (usw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Warrant For Arrest In Rem Issued as to One 2017 Ford Explorer, VIN 1FM5K7F80HGC68616. (tcc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Warrant For Arrest In Rem Issued as to One 2013 Mercedes-Benz GL450, VIN 4JGDF7CE9DA255886. (tcc)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 3:19-CV-00007-TCB 21:881 625 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 1/24/2019 (usw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 275 Honey Lane, Fayetteville, Fayette County, Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE 2013 MERCEDES-BENZ GL450, VIN 4JGDF7CE9DA255886
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2017 Ford Explorer, VIN 1FM5K7F80HGC68616
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 275 Honey Lane, Fayetteville, Fayette County, Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael John Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?