Purcell v. Auto Owners Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Juanita H. Purcell
Defendant: Auto Owners Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00047
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (usw)
June 12, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Superior Court of Haralson County re #10 Remand Letter and #9 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court. (usw)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 REMAND Letter to Superior Court of Haralson County. (usw)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Consent Motion to Remand to Superior Court of Haralson County, GA. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 06/11/2019. (usw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Remand to State Court by Auto Owners Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Jessica)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 Application for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7/15/19 to 7/19/19, by Jessica M. Phillips. (Phillips, Jessica)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Juanita H. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Greenfield, Daniel)
May 29, 2019 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Juanita H. Purcell. (Greenfield, Daniel)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Instructions to Parties and Counsel, signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 05/15/2019. (usw)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER filed in USDC to #1 Complaint within NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto Owners Life Insurance Company.(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER filed in State Court to #1 Complaint within NOTICE OF REMOVAL, by Auto Owners Life Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 10/11/2019.(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Auto Owners Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-8660983) (Attachments: #1 Exh A - Aff Finkbiner, #2 Exh B - State Court Pleadings - Including Complaint and Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Defense Counsel)(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purcell v. Auto Owners Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita H. Purcell
Represented By: Jack Freddie Witcher
Represented By: Daniel Bruce Greenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Owners Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kori Elizabeth Eskridge
Represented By: Jessica M. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?