O'Shields v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Robert O'Shields
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00073
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Robert O'Shields. Commissioner, Social Security Administration served on 8/5/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit proof of service)(Martin, Charles)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Office Regional Chief Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Summons - US Atty General, #2 Summons - US Atty) (rsh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Robert O'Shields. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. As plaintiff is represented by counsel, the Court DIRECTS that plaintiffs counsel arrange for the service of process on the Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 7/3/19. (rsh)
June 27, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (rsh)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert O'Shields. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons US Atty, #5 Summons US Atty Genl, #6 Summons Office Regional Chief Counsel)(rsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Shields v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert O'Shields
Represented By: Charles Lee Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?