Reid v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Scott Reid, General Counsel/Social Security Administration, United States Attorneys Office and Social Security Regional Administration
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00075
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 CLERK'S Notification of Reassignment to US Magistrate Judge Pursuant to Standing Order 07-02 re: Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 3:19-cv-00075-RGV. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (usw)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by General Counsel/Social Security Administration. General Counsel/Social Security Administration served on 7/5/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Receipt)(Hofrichter, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Scott Reid. United States Attorneys Office served on 7/3/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Receipt)(Hofrichter, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Social Security Regional Administration. Social Security Regional Administration served on 7/3/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Receipt)(Hofrichter, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Scott Reid. Scott Reid served on 7/3/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service receipt)(Hofrichter, Michael)
July 16, 2019 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Scott Reid. (Rogers, David)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to U. S. Attorney General and (Attachments: #1 Summons - Office of Regional Chief Counsel, #2 Summons - The General Counsel)(rsh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Scott Reid. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8761588) (Attachments: #1 Exh A - Appeals Council Denial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Reid
Represented By: Michael James Hofrichter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Counsel/Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Attorneys Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Social Security Regional Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?