Torre v. Redding
Plaintiff: Erika Bela Torre and Erika Dela Torre
Defendant: Scott Redding
Case Number: 3:2020cv00033
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Scott Redding re #10 Letter, #9 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (dmb)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 Remand Letter to Magistrate Court of Spalding County (dmb)
April 2, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (dmb)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER adopting #3 Final Report and Recommendation. The Clerk is directed to remand this case back to the Magistrate Court of Spalding County and close this case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 4/1/2020. (dmb)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 31, 2020 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Scott Redding, to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (dmb)
March 25, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Scott Redding re #6 Order. (dmb)
March 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Scott Redding re #5 Order. (usw)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES WITH JUDGE BATTEN PRESIDING IN RE: Chambers Operations Under the Exigent Circumstances Created by COVID-19. The time for discovery in all cases in which discovery has already commenced or will commence prior to 4/16/2020 is extended by thirty days. The Court GRANTS an automatic 15-day extension for submission of proposed pretrial orders in cases where discovery has been closed and that are due on or before 4/16/2020. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 3/18/20. (usw)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DUPLICATE ENTRY General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (dmb) Modified on 3/25/2020 (dmb).
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (dmb)
March 12, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Scott Redding re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (rsh)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 3/12/20. (rsh)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Scott Redding, be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Spalding County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate this reference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 3/12/20. (rsh)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Scott Redding. (Attachments: #1 Dispossessory Affidavit Spalding County, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis (contained within #3 Final R&R). Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 3/12/20. (rsh)
March 2, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (dmb)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Scott Redding. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2020: #3 Dispossessory from Mag Ct of Spalding County) (dmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torre v. Redding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Redding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Bela Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Dela Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?