Farrell-Shanley v. Alterman Properties LLC
Plaintiff: Tamara Jean Farrell-Shanley
Defendant: Alterman Properties LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00113
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 9/2/20. (rsh)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Alterman Properties LLC. Discovery ends on 1/29/2021.(Klein, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Tamara Jean Farrell-Shanley. Alterman Properties LLC served on 7/15/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. (Moore, John)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Alterman Properties LLC Answer due 9/1/2020. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 8/12/2020. (dmb)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Alterman Properties LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, David)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Alterman Properties LLC Answer due 8/18/2020. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 7/23/20. (rsh)
July 23, 2020 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Alterman Properties LLC. (Klein, David)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Alterman Properties LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, David)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Klein on behalf of Alterman Properties LLC (Klein, David)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (dgs) (ADI)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/1/2020. (dmb)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Alterman Properties LLC. (dmb)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9882689) filed by Tamara Jean Farrell-Shanley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farrell-Shanley v. Alterman Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alterman Properties LLC
Represented By: David S. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Jean Farrell-Shanley
Represented By: John A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?