Ashley v. Bennett et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Tarrie Ashley, Sr.
Defendant: C.O. Boyd, C.O. Cason, Sgt. Harrison, Shain Spradlin, Terry Langley, Carroll County Sheriff's Dept., ACE Unit, Kelly Bennett and C.O. Cole
Case Number: 3:2020cv00144
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Warden Carroll County Sheriff's Office. re #9 Report and Recommendation, Order Directing Warden to Collect Monthly Payments from Inmate Account, Add and Terminate Parties, #10 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (dmb)
October 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Aaron Tarrie Ashley, Sr. re #9 Report and Recommendation, Order Directing Warden to Collect Monthly Payments from Inmate Account, Add and Terminate Parties, #10 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,. (dmb)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Service of #9 Report and Recommendation, Order Directing Warden to Collect Monthly Payments from Inmate Account, Add and Terminate Parties by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 10/2/2020. (dmb)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NON-FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Sheriff Langley be DISMISSED as a defendant to this action and that plaintiff's excessive force claims against Officers Bennett and Spradlin be allowed to proceed in the #6 Amended Complaint, filed by Aaron Tarrie Ashley, Sr. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to correct the docket to reflect that Sheriff Terry Langley and Officers Kelly Bennett and Shain Spradlin are the only named defendants in this action. Carroll County Sheriff's Dept., Cason, Cole, Harrison, ACE Unit and Boyd terminated. The Clerk SHALL transmit a copy of this Order to the Sheriff of Carroll County, Georgia. The Sheriff, or his designee, shall collect the aforesaid monthly payments from plaintiff's inmate account and remit such payments to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 10/2/2020. (dmb)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 10/2/2020. (dmb)
October 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Aaron Tarrie Ashley, Sr. re #8 Notice (Other). (dmb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 28, 2020 Submission of #7 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account, #6 Amended Complaint, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (rsh)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Aaron Tarrie Ashley, Sr.. (rsh)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Aaron Tarrie Ashley, Sr. (rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 24, 2020 Submission of #4 Order to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (dmb)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Aaron Tarrie Ashley, Sr. re #5 Notice (Other). (rsh)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 21, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Aaron Tarrie Ashley, Sr. re #4 Order, Forms Sent. (dmb)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to amend complaint and execute and return within 33 days, an Affidavit and Authorization allowing Custodian to withdraw funds from Inmate Account. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to stamp the civil action number on a standard 42 U.S.C. 1983 civil action form and forward the form and the appropriate financial affidavit to plaintiff, together with a copy of this Order. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the assigned Magistrate Judge upon receipt of the amended complaint and full filing and administrative fee or affidavit or at the expiration of the time period noted above. Forms sent to party: Affidavit and Authorization; 42:1983 Forms Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/21/2020. (dmb)
August 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Aaron Tarrie Ashley, Sr. re #3 Order. (rsh)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (rsh)
August 19, 2020 Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account, #1 Complaint, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (rsh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Aaron Tarrie Ashley, Sr. (rsh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Aaron Tarrie Ashley, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashley v. Bennett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Tarrie Ashley, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Cason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shain Spradlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carroll County Sheriff's Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?