Johnson v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Joel D. Johnson
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00161
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joel D. Johnson re #13 Order on Motion to Stay. (dmb)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay preliminary pretrial deadlines pending resolution of Defendant's #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 10/21/2020. (dmb)
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joel D. Johnson. (jpa)
October 15, 2020 Submission of #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (dmb)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Taube, Gregory)
October 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joel D. Johnson re #10 Notice (Other). (dmb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and #7 MOTION to enter an order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Joel D. Johnson. (rlb)
September 23, 2020 Submission of #6 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Pretrial Deadlines, #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (dmb)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Taube, Gregory)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Joel D. Johnson. (jpa)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Pretrial Deadlines with Brief In Support by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Taube, Gregory)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Taube, Gregory)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joel D. Johnson re #3 Notice (Other). (rsh)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joel D. Johnson. (tcc)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 28, 2020 Submission of #1 Notice of Removal to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (dmb)
August 28, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joel D. Johnson re #2 Order. (dmb)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/2020. (dmb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 (TRO/INJ)NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT with . (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-10079553) filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 8/28/2020 to correct docket text(dmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Gregory M. Taube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?