Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Anthony et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Chassity Anthony and Wesley Slaton
Case Number: 3:2021cv00115
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Funds Deposited per Order: $ 63,107.12, receipt number GAN300002146 (dmb)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Authorized deposit in the amount of $60,000. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 9/9/2021. (dmb)
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Consent Order))(Crow, Nikole)
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Wesley Slaton. Discovery ends on 2/4/2022.(Lovejoy, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 9/2/2021. (dmb)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Wesley Slaton served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Crow, Nikole)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Wesley Slaton. (dmb)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for Wesley Slaton (Crow, Nikole)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Joel Meyerson on behalf of Chassity Anthony (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Meyerson, Seth)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Chassity Anthony waiver mailed on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021. (Crow, Nikole)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (jkb)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11127132) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 22, 2021 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Chief Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Anthony et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Nikole Marie Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chassity Anthony
Represented By: Seth Joel Meyerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Slaton
Represented By: William Kyle Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?