Barton et al v. Epps et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Barton and Shirley Barton
Defendant: T and T Farms Inc
Counter Claimant: Robert Lewis Epps
Case Number: 3:2021cv00129
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Lewis Epps, T and T Farms Inc.(Peavy, John)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 8/26/2021. (dmb)
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Robert Lewis Epps, T and T Farms Inc. (Peavy, John)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 Plaintiffs ANSWER to #2 Counterclaim of T&T Farms, Inc. by Eddie Barton, Shirley Barton.(DeMetz, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Disclosures by Robert Lewis Epps, T and T Farms Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit T & T Farms Dec Page)(Peavy, John)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Eddie Barton, Shirley Barton. (DeMetz, Robert)
August 19, 2021 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Chief Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
August 17, 2021 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Chief Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Robert Lewis Epps, T and T Farms Inc. (Peavy, John)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 8/9/2021. (dmb)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 1/3/2022.), COUNTERCLAIM against Eddie Barton, Shirley Barton with Jury Demand by T and T Farms Inc, Robert Lewis Epps.(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by T and T Farms Inc, Robert Lewis Epps. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11161936) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barton et al v. Epps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Barton
Represented By: Robert A. DeMetz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Barton
Represented By: Robert A. DeMetz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Robert Lewis Epps
Represented By: John Hamilton Peavy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T and T Farms Inc
Represented By: John Hamilton Peavy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?