GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc. et al v. The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc. and David James
Defendant: Jon J. Chytka and The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Consolidated Plaintiff: Brain Barrs
Consolidated Defendant: Thomas J. Tickner
Amicus Curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety
Case Number: 4:2014cv00139
Filed: June 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Rome Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Harold L Murphy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER vacating the April 25, 2016, #65 Order and the #66 Clerk's Judgment, and dismissing this action AS MOOT. The Court also VACATES its April 25, 2016, #28 Order in the consolidated action, Civil Action File No. 4:15-CV-0009-HLM, and DISMISSES the consolidated action AS MOOT. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to CLOSE both cases. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 7/3/208. (dob)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER making the USCA mandate the judgment of this Court re #67 Notice of Appeal, Case Appealed to 11th Circuit Case Number 16-13486-AA. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 7/3/2018. (dob)
July 3, 2018 Filing 79 PROPOSED Mandate Order. (dob)
July 3, 2018 Filing 78 Certified copy of ORDER of USCA re: #67 Notice of Appeal, filed by David James, Brain Barrs, Georgia Carry.Org, Inc. Appellants* "Unopposed Motion to Close this Appeal and Remand to District Court isGRANTED. REMAND of matter in full to the district court for the purpose of allowing the district court to vacate its judgments, as contemplated by the district court's indicative rulings and is made the mandate of this Court. The Clerk is directed to close this appeal. Case Appealed to 11th Circuit Case Number 16-13486-AA. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Parties)(dob)
July 3, 2018 Submission of #79 Proposed Order, to District Judge Harold L. Murphy. (dob)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: Plaintiffs' (29) Motion in Member Case 4:15-cv-9-HLM should be granted. The Court has no jurisdiction to grant the Motion, however, because this case is on appeal. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc, 62.1(a)(3), this Court issues an "indicative ruling" that it would grant Plaintiffs' Motion to vacate this Court's judgment on account of mootness if the 11th Circuit were to remand the case for that purpose. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 6/15/18. (bjh)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting #75 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Mary Helen Wimberly for Amicus Curiae Everytown for Gun Safety. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 1/17/17. (bjh)
January 16, 2017 Filing 75 MOTION to Withdraw Mary Helen Wimberly as Attorneyby Everytown for Gun Safety. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wimberly, Mary)
October 18, 2016 Filing 74 Certified copy of ORDER of USCA re #67 Notice of Appeal, filed by David James, Brain Barrs, GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 16-13486-AA. Appellants' unopposed motion to reinstate appeal is GRANTED. (Attachment: #1 USCA Letter)(bjh)
September 27, 2016 Filing 73 Certified copy of ORDER of USCA Dismissing for failure to prosecute re: #67 Notice of Appeal, filed by David James, Brain Barrs, GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc. anad is issured as the Madate of this Court. Case Appealed to 11th Circuit Case Number 16-13486-AA. (dob)
June 21, 2016 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re #67 Notice of Appeal,. (Monroe, John)
June 17, 2016 Filing 71 USCA Acknowledgment of #67 Notice of Appeal, filed by David James, Brain Barrs, GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 16-13486-AA. (Attachment: #1 USCA Letter)(bjh)
June 17, 2016 Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal, #67 Notice of Appeal,. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 16-13486-AA. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (bjh)
June 2, 2016 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (nothing ordered) re #67 Notice of Appeal. Certificate of Readiness due on 6/16/2016. (bjh)
May 23, 2016 Filing 70 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #67 Notice of Appeal. (bjh)
May 23, 2016 Filing 69 NOTICE of Filing Appeal Transmission Letter re #67 Notice of Appeal. (bjh)
May 23, 2016 Filing 68 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re #67 Notice of Appeal,. (Monroe, John)
May 23, 2016 Filing 67 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #66 Clerk's Judgment, #35 Order on Motion for Protective Order,, #18 Order on Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,, #65 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike,, by Brain Barrs, GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 113E-6469632. Transcript Order Form due on 6/6/2016 (Monroe, John)
April 25, 2016 Filing 66 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiffs for costs of action. (bjh)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: the Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike #54 , and GRANTS Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment #45 . The Court DISMISSES Plaintiffs'claims, and DIRECTS the Clerk to CLOSE this case and to PERMANENTLY CLOSE the consolidated case, Civil Action File No. 4: 15-CV-0009-HLM. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 4/25/16. (bjh)
April 25, 2016 Civil Case Terminated. (bjh)
April 8, 2016 Filing 64 Brief in Response to #51 Amicus Curiae Brief re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment , by Brain Barrs, GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Cramer, The Statute of Northampton, #2 Appendix Cramer, Colonial Firearm Regulation)(Monroe, John) Modified on 4/8/2016 to edit text and links to reflect PDF (dob).
March 31, 2016 Filing 63 REPLY BRIEF re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Thomas J. Tickner. (Riess, Daniel)
March 28, 2016 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #54 MOTION to Strike #39 Notice of Filing,, #40 Notice of Filing,,,, #38 Notice of Filing,,,, filed by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Thomas J. Tickner. (Riess, Daniel)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting Defendants' #60 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, not exceeding 20 pages for their Reply Brief in support of their #45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 3/28/16. (bjh)
March 28, 2016 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Thomas J. Tickner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Riess, Daniel)
March 28, 2016 Filing 59 NOTICE by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Thomas J. Tickner re #40 Notice of Filing,,,, (Notice of Filing of Administrative Record Pages SAS AR 2085 - 2103) (Attachments: #1 SAS Admin Record part 27 of 27)(Riess, Daniel)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: the Court DIRECTS counsel for Defendants to electronically file the omitted pages from the administrative record discussed in Defendants' #57 Notice Regarding Filing of Administrative Records WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 3/28/16. (bjh)
March 24, 2016 Filing 57 NOTICE by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Thomas J. Tickner Regarding Filing of Administrative Records (Riess, Daniel)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: To assist the Court in evaluating the pending #45 Motion for Summary Judgment, the Court DIRECTS counsel for Defendants to, WITHIN FOURTEEN(14) DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, provide the Court with a printed courtesy copy of the administrative records in this action (Docket Entry Nos. 37-39). Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 3/11/16. (bjh)
March 9, 2016 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Brain Barrs, GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' statement of Undisputed material facts)(Monroe, John) Modified on 3/10/2016 to edit text to reflect pdf (bjh).
March 9, 2016 Filing 54 MOTION to Strike #39 Notice of Filing, #40 Notice of Filing, #38 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Brain Barrs, GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit Declaration of David James, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Brian Barrs)(Monroe, John) Modified on 3/10/2016 to delete extra text (bjh).
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' #52 Motion for Leave to File a Separate Response to the amicus curiae brief of Everytown for Gun Safety, no later than 4/8/16, no more than 32 pages. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 2/1/16. (bjh)
February 1, 2016 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Brief of Amicus Curiae Everytown for Gun Safety with Brief In Support by GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Monroe, John)
January 20, 2016 Submission of #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment, to District Judge Harold L. Murphy. (bjh)
January 4, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE Of Filing Amicus Curiae Brief and Appendix by Everytown for Gun Safety re #48 Order on Motion for Leave to File (Attachments: #1 Brief Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Appendix Appendix to Amicus Curiae Brief)(Wimberly, Mary)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' #49 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 1/4/16. (bjh)
December 31, 2015 Filing 49 MOTION for Reconsideration re #48 Order on Motion for Leave to File with Brief In Support by Brain Barrs, GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Monroe, John)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Everytown for Gun Safety Leave to File a brief and appendix as amicus curiae in support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment within 7 days. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 12/31/2015. (dob)
December 30, 2015 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief and Appendix in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Everytown for Gun Safety. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit B--Proposed Appendix to Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wimberly, Mary)
December 30, 2015 Filing 46 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Mary Helen Wimberly on behalf of Everytown for Gun Safety. (Wimberly, Mary)
December 23, 2015 Filing 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Thomas J. Tickner. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Riess, Daniel) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting #43 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Briefs in Excess Pages; not to exceed 28 pages regarding the Parties' Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 12/21/15. (bjh)
December 21, 2015 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Thomas J. Tickner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Riess, Daniel)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting Defendants' #41 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file their opening merits brief, including any and all supporting documents related thereto, through and including December 23, 2015, and that Plaintiffs shall be granted an extension of time to file their opening merits brief, including any and all supporting documents related thereto, through and including March 9, 2015. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 12/8/15. (bjh)
December 7, 2015 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opening Merits Brief with Brief In Support by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Thomas J. Tickner. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Riess, Daniel)
November 16, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE Of Filing of Certified Administrative Record Related to Plaintiff Barrs' Request to Carry a Firearm on J. Strom Thurmond Dam and Lake by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Thomas J. Tickner (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Index, #3 Admin Record part 1 of 26, #4 Admin Record part 2 of 26, #5 Admin Record part 3 of 26, #6 Admin Record part 4 of 26, #7 Admin Record part 5 of 26, #8 Admin Record part 6 of 26, #9 Admin Record part 7 of 26, #10 Admin Record part 8 of 26, #11 Admin Record part 9 of 26, #12 Admin Record part 10 of 26, #13 Admin Record part 11 of 26, #14 Admin Record part 12 of 26, #15 Admin Record part 13 of 26, #16 Admin Record part 14 of 26, #17 Admin Record part 15 of 26, #18 Admin Record part 16 of 26, #19 Admin Record part 17 of 26, #20 Admin Record part 18 of 26, #21 Admin Record part 19 of 26, #22 Admin Record part 20 of 26, #23 Admin Record part 21 of 26, #24 Admin Record part 22 of 26, #25 Admin Record part 23 of 26, #26 Admin Record part 24 of 26, #27 Admin Record part 25 of 26, #28 Admin Record part 26 of 26)(Riess, Daniel)
November 16, 2015 Filing 39 NOTICE Of Filing of Certified Administrative Record Related to Plaintiff James' Request to Carry a Firearm on Lake Allatoona Property by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Thomas J. Tickner (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Index, #3 Admin Record part 1 of 10, #4 Admin Record part 2 of 10, #5 Admin Record part 3 of 10, #6 Admin Record part 4 of 10, #7 Admin Record part 5 of 10, #8 Admin Record part 6 of 10, #9 Admin Record part 7 of 10, #10 Admin Record part 8 of 10, #11 Admin Record part 9 of 10, #12 Admin Record part 10 of 10)(Riess, Daniel)
November 16, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE Of Filing of Certified Administrative Record for 36 C.F.R. Part 327 by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Thomas J. Tickner (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Index, #3 Admin Record part 1 of 24, #4 Admin Record part 2 of 24, #5 Admin Record part 3 of 24, #6 Admin Record part 4 of 24, #7 Admin Record part 5 of 24, #8 Admin Record part 6 of 24, #9 Admin Record part 7 of 24, #10 Admin Record part 8 of 24, #11 Admin Record part 9 of 24, #12 Admin Record part 10 of 24, #13 Admin Record part 11 of 24, #14 Admin Record part 12 of 24, #15 Admin Record part 13 of 24, #16 Admin Record part 14 of 24, #17 Admin Record part 15 of 24, #18 Admin Record part 16 of 24, #19 Admin Record part 17 of 24, #20 Admin Record part 18 of 24, #21 Admin Record part 19 of 24, #22 Admin Record part 20 of 24, #23 Admin Record part 21 of 24, #24 Admin Record part 22 of 24, #25 Admin Record part 23 of 24, #26 Admin Record part 24 of 24)(Riess, Daniel)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting #36 Joint Motion to Enter Proposed Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule, and ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: (1) Defendants shall file the administrative record in this case on or before NOVEMBER 16, 2015. (2) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before DECEMBER 15, 2015. (3) Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, including any opposition under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(d) shall be due on or before March 1, 2016. (4) Defendants' reply in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment and their opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due THIRTY (30) DAYS AFTER the filing of Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (5) Plaintiffs' reply in support of their Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due THIRTY (30) DAYS AFTER Defendants file their reply in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment and their opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court further DIRECTS counsel to attach a proposedOrder to any future consent or joint motions, as well as to any future requests for extensions of time or to exceed the page limitations. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 10/19/15. (bjh)
October 16, 2015 Filing 36 Joint MOTION to Enter Proposed Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. (Riess, Daniel)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting Defendant's #32 Motion for Protective Order. The Court ORDERS as follows: (1) the Court's review shall be limited to the administrative record; (2) discovery is prohibited; and (3) the Parties are exempt from filing initial disclosures, pursuant to Local Rule 26.1A and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1 )(B)(i). The Court DIRECTS counsel for the Parties to, WITHIN FORTY-FIVE DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, confer with one another and submit a joint proposed summary judgment briefing schedule to the Court. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 9/1/15. (bjh)
September 1, 2015 Submission of #32 MOTION for Protective Order, to District Judge Harold L. Murphy. (bjh)
August 31, 2015 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Thomas J. Tickner. (Riess, Daniel)
August 14, 2015 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Brain Barrs, GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James. (Monroe, John)
August 14, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION for Protective Order with Brief In Support by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1)(Riess, Daniel) Modified on 8/14/2015 to modify filers to reflect PDF (dob).
August 14, 2015 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers.(Riess, Daniel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 8/14/2015 to modify filers to reflect PDF (dob).
August 3, 2015 Filing 30 Certified copy of JUDGMENT of USCA AFFIRMING the decision of the District Court re: #20 Notice of Appeal, re 29] USCA Order. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 14-13739. (Attachment: #1 USCA Letter)(bjh)
June 9, 2015 Filing 29 Certified copy of ORDER of USCA re: #20 Notice of Appeal filed by David James, GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 14-13739-FF. AFFIRMED. The Court's Mandate will issue at a later date. (Attachment: #1 USCA Letter)(bjh)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: the Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Consolidate Cases (Docket Entry 26 in 4:15-cv-9-HLM), and CONSOLIDATES Civil Action 4:15-cv-9-HLM with Civil Action File No. 4:14-CV-0139-HLM. The Court DIRECTS counsel for the Parties to file all future pleadings, motions, and documents only in Civil Action File No. 4:14-CV-139-HLM, and DIRECTS the Clerk to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE Civil Action 4:15-cv-9-HLM. Pursuant to the Court's August 27, 2014, Order in Civil Action File No. 4:14-CV-139-HLM, the Court STAYS the proceedings, including Defendants' deadline for filing an Answer, until the Eleventh Circuit rules on the appeal in Civil Action File No. 4: 14-CV-139-HLM and issues its mandate returning that case to the Court. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 2/18/15. (bjh)
September 3, 2014 Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal, #20 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 14-13739-FF. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (bjh)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: the Court GRANTS the Motion to Stay #26 , and STAYS the proceedings in this case pending the Eleventh Circuit's ruling on Plaintiffs' appeal. The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #25 . Defendants may re-file that Motion WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS after the Eleventh Circuit rules on Plaintiffs' appeal and returns the case to this Court. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 8/27/14. (bjh)
August 26, 2014 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Stay pending disposition of appeal by GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Monroe, John)
August 22, 2014 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Riess, Daniel)
August 21, 2014 Filing 24 USCA Acknowledgment of #20 Notice of Appeal filed by David James, GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 14-13739-FF. (Attachment: #1 USCA Notice)(bjh)
August 20, 2014 Filing 23 Transmission of Certified Copy of Interlocutory Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #20 Notice of Appeal. (bjh)
August 20, 2014 Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re #20 Notice of Appeal. (Monroe, John)
August 20, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE Of Filing Interlocutory Appeal Transmission re #20 Notice of Appeal. (bjh)
August 20, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #19 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 113E-5352727. Transcript Order Form due on 9/3/2014 (Monroe, John)
August 20, 2014 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (nothing ordered) re #20 Notice of Appeal. Certificate of Readiness due on 9/3/2014. (bjh)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 8/18/14. (bjh)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #16 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default; granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, Jon J. Chytka Answer due 8/22/2014; The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers Answer due 8/22/2014. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 8/15/2014. (dob)
August 14, 2014 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint with Brief In Support by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Riess, Daniel) Modified on 8/15/2014 (dob).
August 14, 2014 Filing 16 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default with Brief In Support by GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Monroe, John)
August 14, 2014 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James. (Monroe, John)
August 14, 2014 Submission of #16 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default, to District Judge Harold L. Murphy. (bjh)
August 14, 2014 Submission of #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, to District Judge Harold L. Murphy. (bjh)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' #13 Motion for Extension of Time through and including August 14, 2014 to file a Reply in support of their #5 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 7/15/14. (bjh)
July 15, 2014 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #11 Response in Opposition to Motion with Brief In Support by GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Monroe, John)
July 15, 2014 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers.(Riess, Daniel)
July 14, 2014 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Riess, Daniel)
July 14, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Riess on behalf of Jon J. Chytka, The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers (Riess, Daniel)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Defendants' #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file their Response, through and including July 14, 2014, to Plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 7/2/14. (bjh)
July 2, 2014 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file opposition to Plaintiff's motion re: #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Jon J. Chytkka. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion for Extension of Time, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Beranek, Lori) Modified on 8/14/2014 to edit filers (bjh).
July 2, 2014 Submission of #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, to District Judge Harold L. Murphy. (bjh)
June 13, 2014 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James. Jon J. Chytka served on 6/13/2014, answer due 8/12/2014. (Monroe, John)
June 13, 2014 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James. The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers served on 6/13/2014, answer due 8/12/2014. (Monroe, John)
June 13, 2014 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit Memorandum and Opinion from District Court of Idaho)(Monroe, John)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, to the extent that Plaintiffs seek atemporary restraining order, a preliminary injunction, orother emergency injunctive relief, directing Plaintiffs to file a separate motion requestingsuch relief, along with a supporting brief. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 6/13/2014. (dob)
June 13, 2014 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jon J. Chytka. (dob)
June 13, 2014 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. (dob)
June 12, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-5236217.), filed by GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc., David James. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc. et al v. The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brain Barrs
Represented By: John R. Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GeorgiaCarry.Org, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David James
Represented By: John R. Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon J. Chytka
Represented By: Daniel M. Riess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Daniel M. Riess
Represented By: Lori M. Beranek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Thomas J. Tickner
Represented By: Daniel M. Riess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety
Represented By: Mary Helen Wimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?