Allen v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Denver Fenton Allen
Defendant: U. S. Department of Agriculture, Walter Johnson, United States District Court, Food and Drug Administration, Alchohol, Tabacco and Fire-arms, United States of America, Harold L. Murphy, Federal Buearu of Investigation and U.S. Department of Treasury
Case Number: 4:2018cv00222
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Walter E Johnson
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Denver Fenton Allen re #7 Clerk's Judgment, #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (tcc)
November 19, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action without prejudice pursuant to U.S.C. 1915(g). (tcc)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - After carefully considering the #4 report and recommendation of the magistrate judge and finding no error, the court receives the report and recommendation with approval and adopts it as the opinion and order of this court, and this action be DISMISSED without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 11/19/2018. (tcc)
November 16, 2018 Submission of #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION,to District Judge Charles A. Pannell Jr.. (tcc)
October 29, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Denver Fenton Allen re #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION.(tcc)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 10/29/2018. (tcc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Clerk is DIRECTED to withdraw the reference to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 10/29/2018. (tcc)
October 16, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Denver Fenton Allen re #3 Order of Recusal,. (klb)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 4:18-CV-222-CAP-JSA. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 10/16/18. (klb)
October 11, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Denver Fenton Allen re #2 Order of Recusal,. (dob)
October 11, 2018 Submission of #1 Complaint, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (dob)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Harold L. Murphy recused. Case reassigned to Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 4:18-cv-222-CAP-WEJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 10/11/2018. (dob)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Denver Fenton Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food and Drug Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alchohol, Tabacco and Fire-arms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold L. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Buearu of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denver Fenton Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?