Tintoria Piana U.S., Inc. v. Robatel, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tintoria Piana U.S., Inc.
Defendant: Robatel, Inc. and Rousselet Centrifugation, S.A.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00227
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Harold L Murphy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tintoria Piana U.S., Inc.. Robatel, Inc. waiver mailed on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Minock, Joseph)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 Clerks Notation re #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Approved by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 10/26/18. (jta)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tintoria Piana U.S., Inc. by Tintoria Piana U.S., Inc..(Minock, Joseph)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Rousselet Centrifugation, S.A.. (jta)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Robatel, Inc.. (jta)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tintoria Piana U.S., Inc.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8215470) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tintoria Piana U.S., Inc. v. Robatel, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tintoria Piana U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan R. Friedman
Represented By: Joseph James Minock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robatel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rousselet Centrifugation, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?