Innovations4Flooring Holding, N.V. v. Carpet Express Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Innovations4Flooring Holding, N.V.
Defendant: Beauflor USA, LLC and Carpet Express Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00256
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Harold L Murphy
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #16 Order on Application for Admission PHV to Attorney William J. McCabe and #17 Order on Application for Admission PHV to Attorney Matthew J. Moffa. (bnp)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew J. Moffa. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 01/04/2019. (bnp)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William James McCabe. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 01/04/2019. (bnp)
January 4, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew J. Moffa Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8356460). Attorney Coby Nixon added appearing on behalf of Beauflor USA, LLC (jkm)
January 4, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of William James McCabe Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8355448). Attorney Coby Nixon added appearing on behalf of Beauflor USA, LLC (jkm)
December 28, 2018 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew J. Moffa Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8356460)by Beauflor USA, LLC. (Nixon, Coby)
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of William James McCabe Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8355448)by Beauflor USA, LLC. (Nixon, Coby)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting the parties' #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, to and including January 31, 2019, for Defendants to respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 12/14/18. (ddm)
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Innovations4Flooring Holding, N.V.. (Lea, Puja)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Anthony W. Brooks. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 12/10/18. (ddm)
December 10, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Anthony W. Brooks re #11 Order. (ddm)
December 10, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony W. Brooks Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8292737). Attorney Anthony W. Brooks added appearing on behalf of Innovations4Flooring Holding, N.V. (pmb)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William M Ray, II for all further proceedings. Judge Harold L. Murphy no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 4:18-cv-256-WMR. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 11/29/18. (jta)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Innovations4Flooring Holding, N.V.. Beauflor USA, LLC served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Lea, Puja)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Innovations4Flooring Holding, N.V.. Carpet Express Inc. served on 11/23/2018, answer due 12/14/2018. (Lea, Puja)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony W. Brooks Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8292737)by Innovations4Flooring Holding, N.V.. (Lea, Puja)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons. approved by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 11/26/18. (jta)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Innovations4Flooring Holding, N.V. identifying Corporate Parent I4F International B.V. for Innovations4Flooring Holding, N.V.. (Lea, Puja)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Beauflor USA, LLC. (jta)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Carpet Express Inc.. (jta)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jta)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Innovations4Flooring Holding, N.V.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8284833). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovations4Flooring Holding, N.V. v. Carpet Express Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beauflor USA, LLC
Represented By: Coby Nixon
Represented By: William J. McCabe
Represented By: Matthew J. Moffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carpet Express Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovations4Flooring Holding, N.V.
Represented By: Dustin Brantley Weeks
Represented By: Puja Patel Lea
Represented By: Anthony W. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?