Rose v. Option One Carriers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dewayne Rose
Defendant: Charlton McBride, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Option One Carriers, LLC and Westfield Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00102
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Harold L Murphy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Pursuant to Local Rule 26.3 by Charlton McBride, Option One Carriers, LLC, Progressive Northern Insurance Company.(Bailey, Melissa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 Initial Disclosures by Charlton McBride, Option One Carriers, LLC, Progressive Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. E - policies)(Bailey, Melissa)
June 19, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #14 Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP. Incorrect PDF attached. Clerk made necessary corrections. (dob)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 Clerks Notation re #9 Certificate of Interested Persons approved by Judge Harold L Murphy on 6/19/2019. (dob) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #1 Correct PDF) (dob).
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 Initial Disclosures by Dewayne Rose. (Attachments: #1 Att. A to Pl. Initial Disclosures, #2 Att. C to P. Initial Disclosures, #3 Att. D to Pl. Initial Disclosures)(Penn, Darren)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dewayne Rose.(Penn, Darren)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Defendant McBride's 1st interrogatories, 1st request for admissions and first request for production of documents to Dewayne Rose by Charlton McBride.(Bailey, Melissa)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Charlton McBride, Option One Carriers, LLC, Progressive Northern Insurance Company. (Bailey, Melissa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Charlton McBride, Option One Carriers, LLC, Progressive Northern Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Northern Insurance Company; Other Affiliate Maurice Holloway, Other Affiliate Lisa Holloway for Option One Carriers, LLC. (Bailey, Melissa)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notation re #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement approved by Judge Harold L Murphy on 6/5/2019. (dob)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Pursuant to Local Rule 26.3 by Charlton McBride, Option One Carriers, LLC, Progressive Northern Insurance Company.(Bailey, Melissa)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dewayne Rose by Dewayne Rose.(Penn, Darren)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Westfield Insurance Company.(Brennan, Thomas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Option One Carriers, LLC.(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Charlton McBride.(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Progressive Northern Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 10/15/2019.(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. filed by Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Charlton McBride, Option One Carriers, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC8670093) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Option One Carriers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Rose
Represented By: Thomas H. Hinson
Represented By: Darren W. Penn
Represented By: James Ian Seifter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlton McBride
Represented By: Frederick Mills Valz, III
Represented By: Melissa Lottie Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Frederick Mills Valz, III
Represented By: Melissa Lottie Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Option One Carriers, LLC
Represented By: Frederick Mills Valz, III
Represented By: Melissa Lottie Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?