Mansel v. Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Heather Mansel
Defendant: Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00175
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Walter E Johnson
Referring Judge: William M Ray
2 Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Oriental Weavers Company for Carpets (S.A.E.) for Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc. by Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc..(Grant, Scott)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT filed by Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc.. Discovery ends on 2/24/2020.(Grant, Scott) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott H. Grant on behalf of Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc. (Grant, Scott)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER - The Court STRIKES the parties' Amended Stipulation 6 . Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b), parties must ask the Court for permission to adjust deadlines. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b) (when an act must be done within a specified time, the court may extend the time for good cause shown). Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 9/20/19. (klb)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER - the Court interprets the Stipulation as a Motion to Extend Time and GRANTS defendant through October 22, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 9/19/19. (klb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Heather Mansel. (Grant, Scott)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc.. (jta)
August 14, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #2 Electronic Summons Issued. PDF incomplete. Clerk has made corrections and docketed at #3 . (jta)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc.. (jta)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Heather Mansel. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8861084) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mansel v. Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Scott H. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Mansel
Represented By: Randolph Scott Jackson, Jr.
Represented By: John Robert McCown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?