Outlaw et al v. Plantation Pipe Line Company et al
Plaintiff: Mary Josephine Outlaw and James Gregory Outlaw
Defendant: Plantation Pipe Line Company and Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00047
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: approving #15 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The parties' request for an 8-month discovery period is GRANTED. Discovery ends on 12/18/2020. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 4/17/20. (rsh)
April 17, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P. and Plantation Pipe Line Company, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., Plantation Pipe Line Company.(Perry, John)
April 17, 2020 Filing 15 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., Plantation Pipe Line Company. (Perry, John)
April 16, 2020 Filing 14 First Initial Disclosures by Mary Josephine Outlaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Satcher, James)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 24, 2020 MINUTE ORDER granting Todd W. Billmire and Richard E. Morton's #8 and #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by CRD at the direction of Timothy C. Batten, Sr. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(usw)
March 23, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Richard E. Morton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9491240).. Attorney Richard E Morton added appearing on behalf of Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., Plantation Pipe Line Company (cdg)
March 23, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Todd W. Billmire Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9491224).. Attorney Todd W. Billmire added appearing on behalf of Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., Plantation Pipe Line Company (cdg)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES WITH JUDGE BATTEN PRESIDING IN RE: Chambers Operations Under the Exigent Circumstances Created by COVID-19. The time for discovery in all cases in which discovery has already commenced or will commence prior to 4/16/2020 is extended by thirty days. The Court GRANTS an automatic 15-day extension for submission of proposed pretrial orders in cases where discovery has been closed and that are due on or before 4/16/2020. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 3/18/20. (usw)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 3/18/2020. (dmb)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Richard E. Morton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9491240). with Brief In Support by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., Plantation Pipe Line Company. (Perry, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 18, 2020 Clerks Notation re #6 Certificate of Interested Persons and #7 Certificate of Interested Persons: Reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Todd W. Billmire Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9491224). with Brief In Support by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., Plantation Pipe Line Company. (Perry, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plantation Pipe Line Company identifying Corporate Parent Exxonmobil Corporation, Corporate Parent Kinder Morgan, Inc. for Plantation Pipe Line Company. (Perry, John)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc. for Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P.. (Perry, John)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., Plantation Pipe Line Company. Discovery ends on 8/17/2020.(Perry, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (dmb)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Mary Josephine Outlaw. Plantation Pipe Line Company served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Satcher, James)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P.. (jta)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Plantation Pipe Line Company. (jta)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mary Josephine Outlaw, James Gregory Outlaw. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9397019) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Outlaw et al v. Plantation Pipe Line Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plantation Pipe Line Company
Represented By: Richard E Morton
Represented By: John Gregory Perry
Represented By: Todd W. Billmire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Richard E Morton
Represented By: John Gregory Perry
Represented By: Todd W. Billmire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Josephine Outlaw
Represented By: James A. Satcher, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gregory Outlaw
Represented By: James A. Satcher, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?