Byfield v. First Community Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Richardo C. Byfield
Defendant: Ginnie Mae, Flagstar Bank, FSB, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, First Community Mortgage and Mortgage Electronic Registration System ("MERS")
Case Number: 4:2020cv00048
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Walter E Johnson
Referring Judge: Harold L Murphy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richardo C. Byfield re #11 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #12 Order for Service of Final Report and Recommendation. (klb)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Service of #11 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 4/15/20. (klb)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - Because plaintiff has refused to obey a lawful Order of the Court, this case may be dismissed for want of prosecution. Accordingly, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that the Motions to Dismiss [2, 3] be GRANTED as to all defendants and the Complaint be DISMISSED. The Clerk is directed to terminate the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 4/15/20. (klb)
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Flagstar Bank, FSB, Mortgage Electronic Registration System ("MERS"). Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 4/15/20. (klb)
April 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richardo C. Byfield re #10 Notice. (bjh)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 31, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richardo C. Byfield re #9 Order to Show Cause. (klb)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - is ORDERED that, on or before April 13, 2020, plaintiff pro se must explain to the Court in writing why those Motions should not be granted. The Court will recommend dismissal of this case for want of prosecution if plaintiff pro se does not comply with this Order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); N.D. Ga. Civ. R. 41.3(A)(2) (The court may, with or without notice to the parties, dismiss a civil case for want of prosecution if... [a] plaintiff... shall, after notice,... fail or refuse to obey a lawful order of the court in the case....). The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned after expiration of the above deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 3/31/20. (klb)
March 25, 2020 Submission of #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (bjh)
March 20, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richardo C. Byfield re #8 Order. (bjh)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (bjh)
March 17, 2020 Submission of #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (bjh)
March 9, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richardo C. Byfield re #7 Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP. (bjh)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 Clerks Notation re #6 Certificate of Interested Persons, signed on 3/9/20 by Judge Harold L. Murphy. (bjh)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Community Mortgage identifying Corporate Parent First Community Bank of Tennessee, Corporate Parent First Community Bankcorp, Inc. for First Community Mortgage. (Lockett, John)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons, signed on 3/5/20 by Judge Harold L. Murphy. (bjh)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flagstar Bank, FSB, Mortgage Electronic Registration System ("MERS"), Wells Fargo Bank, NA identifying Corporate Parent Flagstar Bancorp Inc. for Flagstar Bank, FSB; Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Anderson, Keith)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by First Community Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit Byfield Security Deed)(Lockett, John)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Flagstar Bank, FSB, Mortgage Electronic Registration System ("MERS"), Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Anderson, Keith)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. filed by Flagstar Bank, FSB, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Mortgage Electronic Registration System ("MERS"). (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC9415374) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byfield v. First Community Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginnie Mae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Represented By: Keith Steven Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: Keith Steven Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Community Mortgage
Represented By: John A. Lockett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System ("MERS")
Represented By: Keith Steven Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richardo C. Byfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?