Williams v. Gill Industries-Georgia, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jason Williams
Defendant: Gill Industries-Georgia, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00143
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Gill Industries-Georgia, Inc.. Discovery ends on 12/11/2020.(Glasgow, Julia) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (dgs) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (adg) (ADI)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons , as to Gill Industries - Georgia, Inc. c/o CT Corporation. (McCown, John)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/16/20. (bnw)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 THIRD AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDERTHE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/2020. (dob)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Gill Industries-Georgia, Inc.. (dob)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jason Williams. (Filing fee $400, receipt number BGANDC9794501) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Gill Industries-Georgia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gill Industries-Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie Kali Eason
Represented By: Julia Christine Glasgow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Williams
Represented By: John Robert McCown
Represented By: Randolph Scott Jackson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?