Amos v. Mohawk ESV, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amber Amos
Defendant: Mohawk ESV, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00184
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Walter E Johnson
Referring Judge: Harold L Murphy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Amber Amos. (Jackson, Randolph)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notation re #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement approved by Judge Harold L Murphy on 9/8/2020. (dob)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mohawk ESV, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mohawk Carpet, LLC for Mohawk ESV, Inc. by Mohawk ESV, Inc..(Shultz, Chad)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Mohawk ESV, Inc.. Discovery ends on 2/1/2021.(Shultz, Chad) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Amber Amos. (dob)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Amber Amos (McCown, John)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 2001 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENTCIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/6/2020. (dob)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Amber Amos. (Filing fee $400, receipt number BGANDC9998742) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amos v. Mohawk ESV, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohawk ESV, Inc.
Represented By: Chad Allan Shultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Amos
Represented By: John Robert McCown
Represented By: Randolph Scott Jackson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?