BOZZIE v. EMMONS
Petitioner: FRANK SCOTT BOZZIE
Respondent: Shawn Emmons
Case Number: 4:2020cv00212
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Walter E Johnson
Referring Judge: Harold L Murphy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to FRANK SCOTT BOZZIE re #10 Order. (aar)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/01/20. (aar)
September 16, 2020 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (aar)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:20-cv-00281. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 16, 2020 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Northern District of Georgia, Rome Division. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**(Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 9/30/2020.) (ggs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 9/16/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Rome Division. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 9/16/2020. (chc) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 9/16/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Issuance of a Brady Order Filed by FRANK SCOTT BOZZIE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE. NOTE: Document is a proposed order.(ggs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 9/16/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND SUPPORTING FACTS filed by FRANK SCOTT BOZZIE re #5 Recast Petition (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 9/16/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 RECAST #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against SHAWN EMMONS by FRANK SCOTT BOZZIE (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Inner Envelope, #3 Mailing Envelope)(ggs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 9/16/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing fee Paid: Habeas $5, Manual Receipt No. 42295. (ggs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 9/16/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Recast Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, ORDER to File Prisoner Account Statement (Certified Copy) or Pay the Filing Fee. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 8/7/2020. (ggs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 9/16/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Service Copy of Notice of Appeal filed in the Superior Court of Macon County as to his State Habeas Petition by FRANK SCOTT BOZZIE (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 9/16/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 9/16/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS,filed by FRANK SCOTT BOZZIE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 9/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOZZIE v. EMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FRANK SCOTT BOZZIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shawn Emmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?