Surya Carpet, Inc. v. Art of Floors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Surya Carpet, Inc.
Defendant: Art of Floors, LLC and Thomas Etheridge
Case Number: 4:2020cv00222
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (ah)
November 16, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ah)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of All Defendants filed by Surya Carpet, Inc. (Seigel, Mark)
October 13, 2020 Submission of AO Form 121 - Notice to Parties, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (ah)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 2001 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENTCIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (dob)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Thomas Etheridge. (dob)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Art of Floors, LLC. (dob)
September 29, 2020 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (dob)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Surya Carpet, Inc.. (dob)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Surya Carpet, Inc.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC10193804) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Surya Carpet, Inc. v. Art of Floors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surya Carpet, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Lawrence Seigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art of Floors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Etheridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?