Fleet Connect Solutions v. Dayton Freight Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fleet Connect Solutions
Defendant: Dayton Freight Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00280
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (dgs) (ADI)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dayton Freight Lines, Inc. Answer due 3/3/2021. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/26/2021. (rjs)
January 25, 2021 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Fleet Connect Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Second Motion to Extend Time)(Hill, Steven)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Dayton Freight Lines, Inc. Answer due 2/1/2021. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/29/2020. (bdb)
December 23, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fleet Connect Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion to Extend Time)(Hill, Steven)
December 14, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Fleet Connect Solutions. Dayton Freight Lines, Inc. served on 12/10/2020, answer due 12/31/2020. (Hill, Steven)
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint as to Dayton Freight Lines, Inc.. (Hill, Steven)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
December 8, 2020 Refund in the amount of $402.00 has been processed, effective 12/8/2020 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
December 3, 2020 Clerks Approval re #7 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 10432451. (Hill, Steven)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fleet Connect Solutions by Fleet Connect Solutions.(Hill, Steven)
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 FILED IN ERROR-Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fleet Connect Solutions by Fleet Connect Solutions.(Hill, Steven) Modified on 12/1/2020, Corrected filing in #6 (bdb).
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Dayton Freight Lines, Inc. (bjh)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (bjh)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (bjh)
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Fleet Connect Solutions. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10433111) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exh A, #3 Exh B, #4 Exh C, #5 Exh D)(bjh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleet Connect Solutions v. Dayton Freight Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fleet Connect Solutions
Represented By: Steven G. Hill
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayton Freight Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?