Maverick Fund, Ltd. et al v. Mohawk Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C., Maverick USA, L.P. and Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd.
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Lorberbaum, Frank H. Boykin, Brian Carson and Mohawk Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00118
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 8/19/2021. (dmb)
August 19, 2021 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Frank H. Boykin, Brian Carson, Jeffrey S. Lorberbaum, Mohawk Industries, Inc..(Long, Robert)
August 18, 2021 Submission of #23 Unopposed MOTION to Stay to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (dmb)
August 4, 2021 MINUTE ORDER granting Shawn M. Hays's #22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by CRD at the direction of Chief Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(usw)
July 30, 2021 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Mohawk Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Long, Robert)
July 29, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #22 APPLICATION for Admission of Shawn M. Hays Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Shawn M. Hays added appearing on behalf of Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick USA, L.P., Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C. (nmb)
July 23, 2021 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission of Shawn M. Hays Pro Hac Vice.by Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick USA, L.P., Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C.. (Bain, Karen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 21, 2021 RETURN of #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Shawn M. Hays Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11106429). to attorney for correction re: Form. (nmb)
July 15, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #20 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew P. Siben Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Matthew Philip Siben added appearing on behalf of Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick USA, L.P., Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C. (nmb)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #19 and #20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by CRD at the direction of Chief Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(usw)
July 15, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #19 APPLICATION for Admission of David A. Thorpe Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney David A. Thorpe added appearing on behalf of Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick USA, L.P., Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C. (nmb)
July 14, 2021 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission of Shawn M. Hays Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11106429).by Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick USA, L.P., Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C.. (Bain, Karen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 14, 2021 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew P. Siben Pro Hac Vice.by Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick USA, L.P., Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C.. (Bain, Karen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 14, 2021 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of David A. Thorpe Pro Hac Vice.by Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick USA, L.P., Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C.. (Bain, Karen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 12, 2021 Filing 18 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Shawn M. Hays. Clerk to follow-up by 7/22/2021. (cdg)
July 12, 2021 RETURN of #9 APPLICATION for Admission of David A. Thorpe Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction regarding local counsel address. (nmb)
July 12, 2021 RETURN of #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew P. Siben Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction regarding local counsel address. (nmb)
July 9, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Ellen Quiros on behalf of Mohawk Industries, Inc. (Quiros, Courtney)
July 9, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Gingold Clark on behalf of Mohawk Industries, Inc. (Clark, Elizabeth)
July 9, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R Long, IV on behalf of Mohawk Industries, Inc. (Long, Robert)
July 2, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C., Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick USA, L.P.. Brian Carson waiver mailed on 7/1/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Bain, Karen)
July 1, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C., Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick USA, L.P.. Frank H. Boykin waiver mailed on 7/1/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Bain, Karen)
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C., Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick USA, L.P.. Jeffrey S. Lorberbaum waiver mailed on 7/1/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Bain, Karen)
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C., Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick USA, L.P.. Mohawk Industries, Inc. waiver mailed on 7/1/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Bain, Karen)
July 1, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew P. Siben Pro Hac Vice.by Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick USA, L.P., Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C.. (Bain, Karen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of David A. Thorpe Pro Hac Vice.by Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick USA, L.P., Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C.. (Bain, Karen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 1, 2021 RETURN of #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew P. Siben Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11063557). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel. (cdg)
July 1, 2021 RETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of David A. Thorpe Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11063576). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel. (cdg)
July 1, 2021 Clerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Chief U.S. District Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick USA, L.P., Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C.. (Scarbrough, Tyler)
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of David A. Thorpe Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11063576).by Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick USA, L.P., Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C.. (Scarbrough, Tyler) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew P. Siben Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11063557).by Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick USA, L.P., Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C.. (Scarbrough, Tyler) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brian Carson. (bjh)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Frank H. Boykin. (bjh)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jeffrey S. Lorberbaum. (bjh)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mohawk Industries, Inc. (bjh)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C., Maverick Fund II, Ltd., Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd., Maverick Fund, Ltd., Maverick Long Fund, Ltd., Maverick USA, L.P. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11059269) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bjh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maverick Fund, Ltd. et al v. Mohawk Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maverick Fund II, Ltd.
Represented By: Tyler Scarbrough
Represented By: Karen Bain
Represented By: David A. Thorpe
Represented By: Matthew Philip Siben
Represented By: Shawn M. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maverick Long Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Tyler Scarbrough
Represented By: Karen Bain
Represented By: David A. Thorpe
Represented By: Matthew Philip Siben
Represented By: Shawn M. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maverick Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Tyler Scarbrough
Represented By: Karen Bain
Represented By: David A. Thorpe
Represented By: Matthew Philip Siben
Represented By: Shawn M. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprugos Investments IX, L.L.C.
Represented By: Tyler Scarbrough
Represented By: Karen Bain
Represented By: David A. Thorpe
Represented By: Matthew Philip Siben
Represented By: Shawn M. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maverick USA, L.P.
Represented By: Tyler Scarbrough
Represented By: Karen Bain
Represented By: David A. Thorpe
Represented By: Matthew Philip Siben
Represented By: Shawn M. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maverick Long Enhanced Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Tyler Scarbrough
Represented By: Karen Bain
Represented By: David A. Thorpe
Represented By: Shawn M. Hays
Represented By: Matthew Philip Siben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Lorberbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank H. Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohawk Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney Ellen Quiros
Represented By: Elizabeth Gingold Clark
Represented By: Robert R Long, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?