Clapham v. United Rentals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Clapham
Defendant: Terex Corporation, United Rentals, Inc. and Palfinger USA, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00124
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER - The above entitled action is presently before the Court pursuant to the filing of the parties' Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Schedule #7 . The Court has reviewed and approves the parties Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Schedule. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the eight-month discovery deadline is April 20, 2022. Any Motions for Summary Judgment must be filed by May 20, 2022, and if no Motions for Summary Judgment are filed, the Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order will be due on May 20, 2022. However, if a Motion for Summary Judgment is filed, the Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order will be due within 30 days of the Court's ruling on the Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are directed to adhere to the above deadlines. The Clerk is directed to submit this action on May 21, 2022, if the parties have not filed a Motion for Summary Judgment or Proposed Pretrial Order. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 8/25/2021. (tcc)
August 25, 2021 Filing 22 Initial Disclosures by United Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(Fox, Warner)
August 24, 2021 Filing 21 Initial Disclosures by Palfinger USA, LLC.(DeFrank, Steven)
August 23, 2021 Filing 20 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Ashley Clapham. (Cooper, Lance)
August 20, 2021 Filing 19 Initial Disclosures by Terex Corporation.(Sager, Frederick)
August 19, 2021 Filing 18 Initial Disclosures by Ashley Clapham.(Cooper, Lance)
August 17, 2021 Filing 17 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Zachary M. Wilson. Clerk to follow-up by 8/27/2021. (nmb)
August 6, 2021 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Persons by Ashley Clapham. (Cooper, Lance)
July 28, 2021 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons by United Rentals, Inc.. (Ream, Elliott)
July 28, 2021 Filing 14 United Rentals' Answer ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by United Rentals, Inc..(Ream, Elliott) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 27, 2021 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Palfinger USA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Palfinger Americas GmbH, Other Affiliate Omaha Standard, LLC, Other Affiliate Palfinger US Holdings, Inc. for Palfinger USA, LLC. (DeFrank, Steven)
July 21, 2021 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Terex Corporation. (Sager, Frederick)
July 21, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Terex Corporation.(Sager, Frederick) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 21, 2021 Filing 10 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT For Damages by Palfinger USA, LLC. Discovery ends on 12/20/2021.(DeFrank, Steven) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 7/19/2021. (cmd)
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Ashley Clapham. Terex Corporation served on 7/1/2021, answer due 7/22/2021. (Cooper, Lance)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Ashley Clapham. Palfinger USA, LLC served on 7/1/2021, answer due 7/22/2021. (Cooper, Lance)
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Ashley Clapham. United Rentals, Inc. served on 7/1/2021, answer due 7/22/2021. (Cooper, Lance)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Palfinger USA, LLC. (dob)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to United Rentals, Inc.. (dob)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Terex Corporation. (dob)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ashley Clapham. (dob)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ashley Clapham. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC11073501) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clapham v. United Rentals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terex Corporation
Represented By: Frederick Newman Sager, Jr.
Represented By: Lindsay Gatling Ferguson
Represented By: Michael Weathington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary M. Wilson, III
Represented By: Elliott Crawford Ream
Represented By: Warner S. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palfinger USA, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Michael Schatz
Represented By: Steven J. DeFrank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Clapham
Represented By: Kendall Dunson
Represented By: Sherri Lynn Dillard Doss
Represented By: Myles Eric Eastwood
Represented By: Lance Alan Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?