Manley v. Locsin et al
Plaintiff: Eric Maney and Mr. Eric Manley
Defendant: Consular Affairs Teodoro L. Locsin, Jr. and Jose Manuel "Babe&quot del Gallego Romualdez
Case Number: 4:2021cv00157
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Submission of #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (tmf)
October 1, 2021 Filing 8 SECOND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (not duplicate of #7 ; contains addition pages)by Eric Manley. (dob)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Eric Manley. (tmf)
September 14, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eric Manley re #5 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (tmf)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff Eric Manley ("Manley")'s Motion to For Service of Defendants by the United States Marshal [Doc. #3 ] is DENIED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to change Plaintiff's name in the caption of this case from "Eric Maney" to "Erie Manley." Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/13/2021. (tmf)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE Of Filing AFFIDAVIT OF DUE-DILIGENCE by Eric Manley (tmf)
August 20, 2021 Submission of #3 MOTION for US Marshall Service, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (tmf)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Teodoro L. Locsin, Jr., Jose Manuel "Babe" del Gallego Romualdez. (Attachments: #1 Summons Romualdez)(tmf) Modified on 8/19/2021 to edit text(tmf).
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for US Marshall Service by Eric Maney. (dob)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/17/2021. (tmf)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Eric Maney. (Filing fee $402, receipt number GAN100132222) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 17, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eric Maney re #2 Order. (tmf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manley v. Locsin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Maney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Eric Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consular Affairs Teodoro L. Locsin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Manuel "Babe&quot del Gallego Romualdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?