Abe v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: Omobolade Lolade Abe
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur. Jaddou and Terri A. Robinson
Case Number: 4:2021cv00233
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Imerman on behalf of Merrick B. Garland, Ur. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Terri A. Robinson (Imerman, Susan)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/14/21. (jpa)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kurt R. Erskine, U.S. Attorney. (jpa)
December 10, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Omobolade Lolade Abe (Zambrano, Shirley)
December 8, 2021 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Terri A. Robinson. (dob)
December 8, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Alejandro Mayorkas. (dob)
December 8, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ur. Jaddou. (dob)
December 8, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Merrick B. Garland. (dob)
December 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Shirley Cristina Zambrano on behalf of Omobolade Lolade Abe. (dob)
December 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Omobolade Lolade Abe. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC11446478) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abe v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omobolade Lolade Abe
Represented By: Shirley Cristina Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland
Represented By: Susan Imerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Susan Imerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur. Jaddou
Represented By: Susan Imerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri A. Robinson
Represented By: Susan Imerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?