Plaintiff v. Defendant
Plaintiff: Plaintiff
Defendant: Defendant
Case Number: 4:2021mi99999
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 25 Civil Case No 4:21-cv-42-SDG 880 18:1836b Case Initiating Documents-Complaint IVC US, Inc. vs. Huali Group (U.S.), LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10757743. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Huali Group (U.S), LLC, #3 Summons Steven Fountain, #4 Summons Matthew Drobnick, #5 Summons Gary Stahl, #6 Summons Chun-Wei (Will) Shao, #7 Affidavit Verification of Todd Huber, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A - Fountain Employment Agreement, #9 Exhibit Exhibit B - Stahl Employment Agreement, #10 Exhibit Exhibit C - Drobnick Employment Agreement, #11 Exhibit Exhibit D - Shao Employment Agreement)(Monroe, John) Modified on 2/24/2021 (dob).
February 23, 2021 Filing 24 CIVIL ACTION NO. 4:21-cv-40-TWT 893 33:1365 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Earl Parris, Jr. vs. 3M Company,. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10751913. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dean, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/23/2021 (bjh).
February 19, 2021 Filing 23 CIVIL ACTION NO. 4:21-cv-39-WMR 710 29:201fl Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Diedre Frazier vs. D & S Commercial Paint, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BGANDC-10739881. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Lizana, Arnold) Modified on 2/19/2021 (bjh).
February 17, 2021 Filing 22 CIVIL CASE NO: 4:21-CV-36-HLM/WEJ 864 42:0405 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint RAY BOWEN vs. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AC DENIAL, #2 Affidavit IFP, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Cates, Patrick) Modified on 2/17/2021 (jta).
February 12, 2021 Filing 21 Civil Case No 4:21-cv-24-HLM 442 29:0626 Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Michael Taylor vs. Georgia-Pacific Wood Products LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10718218. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Korhonen, Jana) Modified on 2/24/2021 (dob).
February 11, 2021 Filing 20 Civil Case No 4:21-cv-32-JPB 110 28:1332in Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Juan Palacio vs. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10714815. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions Directed to Defendant, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Answer, #5 William E. Zschunke Verification, #6 Affidavit Affidavit of William E. Zschunke, #7 Jury Demand, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Zschunke, William) Modified on 2/11/2021 (dob).
February 11, 2021 Filing 19 Civil Case No 4:21-cv-31-SCJ 440 42:1983cv Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Bernardo Ruiz-Hernandez vs. Paulding County. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10713823. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Reba, Stephen) Modified on 2/11/2021 (dob).
February 10, 2021 Filing 18 CIVIL ACTION NO. 4:21-cv-29-MHC 350 28:1441mv Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Richard Moreta vs. Gregory Conrady. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10708771. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages, #3 Exhibit 2 - Answer of Defendants, #4 Exhibit 3 - Sheriff's Entry of Service - Smith Family Farms Trucking, LLC, #5 Exhibit 4 - Sheriff's Entry of Service - Gregory Conrady, #6 Exhibit 5 - Sheriff's Entry of Service - Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc., #7 Exhibit 6 - Affidavit of Evan E. Smith, IV)(Smith, Evan) Modified on 2/10/2021 (bjh).
February 5, 2021 Filing 17 CIVIL CASE NO: 4:21-CV-27-MHC 440 42:1983cv Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Tami Colts vs. City of Rome. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10695757. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Superior Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Notice Removal Sup Ct)(Davis, Jesse) Modified on 2/5/2021 (jta).
February 5, 2021 Filing 16 CIVIL CASE NO: 4:21-CV-26-TCB 360 28:1332pi Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Wanda Elaine Goolsby vs. Walmart, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10693431. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Demand, #3 Exhibit B - Superior Court Pleadings)(Lessinger, Howard) Modified on 2/5/2021 (jta).
February 4, 2021 Filing 15 CIVIL CASE NO: 4:21-CV-25-HLM/WEJ 863 42:0405 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint CHARLES W. TANKERSLEY vs. ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion to File IFP, #3 IFP Application, #4 Summons Atty Gen, #5 Summons Defendant, #6 Summons US Atty)(Hogan, John) Modified on 2/4/2021 (jta).
February 3, 2021 Filing 14 Civil Case No 4:21-cv-24-HLM-WEJ 442 42:2000ra Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Paul Thomas Johnson III vs. Engineered Floors, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10685744. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Farahany, Amanda) Modified on 2/3/2021 (dob).
January 26, 2021 Filing 13 Civil Case No 4L21-cv-21-HLM WEJ 442 42:2000sx Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Elizabeth Ngugi vs. Shaw Industries Group, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10651626. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - All state court process and pleadings in this case, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Furrow, Justin) Modified on 1/27/2021 (dob).
January 26, 2021 Filing 12 CIVIL ACTION NO. 4:21-cv-19-HLM-WEJ 442 42:1981 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint SHANNON CAMMACK vs. SOUTHEASTERN MILLS, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10647694. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Roberts, Victor) Modified on 1/26/2021 (bjh).
January 25, 2021 Filing 11 CIVIL ACTION NO. 4:21-cv-18-MHC 446 42:12181 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Holt, Dakota vs. Muqadaas Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10645338. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig) Modified on 1/25/2021 (bjh).
January 25, 2021 Filing 10 CIVIL CASE NO: 4:21-CV-16 HLM-WEJ 445 42:12101 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Daniella Aguilar vs. Rent-A-Tire, L.P.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10643355. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hill, Janet) Modified on 1/25/2021 (jta).
January 21, 2021 Filing 9 Civil Case No 4:21-cv-14-HLM 751 29:2601 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lucindia Monday vs. Community Health Services of Georgia, dba System Administrative Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10630869. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Miller, Adian) Modified on 1/21/2021 (dob).
January 21, 2021 Filing 8 Civil Case No 4:21-cv-13-SCJ 422 28:0158 Case Initiating Documents-Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 20-40329. Notice of Appeal filed 01/20/2021 from Order entered 12/17/2020 and 01/06/2021 by Appellant Humphreys Fund I REIT, LLC. Fee Paid: Yes. USBC Receipt No. 54951261. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Public Docket, #2 Exhibit Doc 103 Order, #3 Exhibit Doc 113 Order, #4 Exhibit Doc 119 NOA)(Gentry, Rhonda) Modified on 1/21/2021 (dob).
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 Civil Case No 4:21-cv-11-HLM-WEJ 442 42:1981ra Case Initiating Documents-Complaint MELONDY STRICKLAND vs. HIGHLAND FAMILY DENTISTRY, P.C.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10620592. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Roberts, Victor) Modified on 1/19/2021 (dob).
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL ACTION NO. 4:21-cv-9-WMR 350 28:1441mv Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Sandy Lee Smith vs. Amed Hassan Duad. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10609792. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Superior Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Answer of Ds, #4 Exhibit C - Notice to Superior Court)(Davis, Jesse) Modified on 1/15/2021 (bjh).
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL ACTION NO. 4:21-CV-8-jpb 140 28:1332 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Firstbank vs. Benjamin W. Reichel. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10594359. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Summons Benjamin Reichel, #7 Summons Maria Reichel, #8 Corporate Disclosure)(Maddux, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/21/2021 (bjh).
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL CASE NO: 4:21-CV-7-HLM-WEJ 863 42:0405wc Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Danielle Robertson vs. Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Administration. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Proposed Order, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Office Regional Chief Counsel, #6 Summons Attorney General)(Piemonte, George) Modified on 1/12/2021 (jta).
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL CASE NO: 4:21-CV-6-TCB 446 42:12101 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Holt, Dakota vs. NEELKANTH 101211 LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10578557. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig) Modified on 1/8/2021 (jta). Modified on 1/8/2021 (jta).
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL CASE NO: 4:21-CV-5-HLM/WEJ 863 42:0405ww Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Valerie M. Stone vs. Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Letter to Clerk, #4 In Forma Pauperis, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Olinsky, Howard) Modified on 1/7/2021 (jta).
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 Civil Case No 4:21-cv-1-WMR 446 42:12101 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Holt, Dakota vs. La Mara II, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-10561585. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Defendant La Mara II, Inc., #3 Summons for Defendant Cat Daddy Corner, LLC)(Ehrlich, Craig) Modified on 1/4/2021 (dob).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plaintiff v. Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?