Home-Owners Insurance Company v. Fox et al
Plaintiff: Home-Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Laurie Fox and Riyajill, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00021
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Home-Owners Insurance Company. Riyajill, Inc. served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022. (Tuz, Nicholas)
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Home-Owners Insurance Company. Laurie Fox served on 2/2/2022 answer due 2/23/2022. (Tuz, Nicholas) Modified on 2/9/2022 to edit serve and answer date to reflect PDF (dob).
February 9, 2022 Notification of Docket Correction re #7 Return of Service Executed. Clerk edited serve and answer dates to reflect PDF. Re-set deadlines. (dob)
February 7, 2022 Filing 6 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw)
January 25, 2022 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home-Owners Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Company for Home-Owners Insurance Company. (Tuz, Nicholas)
January 24, 2022 Filing 4 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 4, 2022 through and including April 14, 2022; June 17, 2022 through and including June 27, 2022; September 1, 2022 through and including September 12, 2022; November 18, 2022 through and including November 28, 2022; December 23, 2022 through and including January 2, 2023, by Michael C. Kendall. (Kendall, Michael)
January 24, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Riuajill, Inc... (dob)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Laurie Fox. (dob)
January 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Home-Owners Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC11534) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home-Owners Insurance Company v. Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Represented By: Nicholas B Tuz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riyajill, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?