Home-Owners Insurance Company v. The Wyndsor at Mineral Museum Drive Condominium Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Home-Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: The Wyndsor at Mineral Museum Drive Condominium Association, Inc. and The Estate of Diane Marie Serra
Case Number: 4:2022cv00047
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #18 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. After reviewing the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan completed and filed by the parties, the Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 04/14/2022. (jkb)
April 14, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Maggie-Machre K Garrett on behalf of The Wyndsor at Mineral Museum Drive Condominium Association, Inc. (Garrett, Maggie-Machre)
April 14, 2022 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed and approved by SDG. (ash)
April 8, 2022 Filing 18 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Home-Owners Insurance Company. (Tuz, Nicholas)
April 8, 2022 Filing 17 Initial Disclosures by Home-Owners Insurance Company.(Tuz, Nicholas)
April 6, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Hasson, Keith)
April 5, 2022 Filing 15 First Initial Disclosures by The Wyndsor at Mineral Museum Drive Condominium Association, Inc..(Younker, David)
April 5, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Compliance with Standing Order (Younker, David)
April 5, 2022 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by The Wyndsor at Mineral Museum Drive Condominium Association, Inc..(Younker, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 5, 2022 Filing 12 Initial Disclosures by The Estate of Diane Marie Serra.(Hasson, Keith)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, The Wyndsor at Mineral Museum Drive Condominium Association, Inc. Answer due 4/5/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 03/21/2022. (jkb)
March 18, 2022 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by The Wyndsor at Mineral Museum Drive Condominium Association, Inc.. (Younker, David)
March 9, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by The Estate of Diane Marie Serra. Discovery ends on 8/8/2022.(Hasson, Keith) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 2, 2022 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Home-Owners Insurance Company. The Estate of Diane Marie Serra served on 2/28/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (Kendall, Michael)
March 2, 2022 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Home-Owners Insurance Company. The Wyndsor at Mineral Museum Drive Condominium Association, Inc. served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Kendall, Michael)
February 23, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Kendall, Michael)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on February 22, 2022. (ash)
February 21, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home-Owners Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY for Home-Owners Insurance Company. (Kendall, Michael)
February 21, 2022 Filing 3 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 4, 2022 through and including April 14, 2022; June 17, 2022 through and including June 27, 2022; September 1, 2022 through and including September 12, 2022; November 18, 2022 through and including November 28, 2022; December 23, 2022 through and including January 2, 2023, by Michael C. Kendall. (Kendall, Michael)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Estate of Diane Marie Serra, The Wyndsor at Mineral Museum Drive Condominium Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Wyndsor)(tmf)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Home-Owners Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11601832) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Underlying Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit B - 2-20-2022 Ltr to The Wyndsor at Mineral Museum Drive, #3 Exhibit C - 5-15-2020 Ltr to The Wyndsor at Mineral Museum Drive, #4 Exhibit D - 10-28-2020 Ltr to Alicia Argo, #5 Exhibit E - Reservation of Rights Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Supplemental Reservation of Rights Letter, #7 Exhibit G - Policy, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home-Owners Insurance Company v. The Wyndsor at Mineral Museum Drive Condominium Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Represented By: Nicholas B Tuz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wyndsor at Mineral Museum Drive Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Younker
Represented By: Maggie-Machre K Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Diane Marie Serra
Represented By: Keith Hasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?