Rivera v. Humphrey

Petitioner: Reinaldo Javier Rivera
Respondent: Carl Humphrey
Case Number: 1:2013cv00161
Filed: September 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: Butts
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying 108 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying as moot 115 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 06/21/2019. (maa)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER denying as moot 97 Motion to Stay; granting 102 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Court hereby vacates the stay of the present case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/22/2018. (maa)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying 71 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 78 Motion to Appoint Supplemental Counsel ; terminating 95 Motion Requesting a Ruling. The Court also ORDERS the Clerk to UNSEAL all documents related to Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Supplemental Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/06/2017. (maa)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER scheduling a telephone hearing on 80 Motion for Reconsideration and 78 Motion to Appoint Counsel, filed by Reinaldo Javier Rivera. (Telephone Conference set for 9/15/2016 10:00 AM before Judge J. Randal Hall). Respondent's deadline to respond to the Petitioner's motion 78 is stayed. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/2/16. (cmr)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting Petitioner's 72 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Supplemental Counsel; directing the Clerk to file Petitioner's motion to appoint supplemental counsel UNDER DEAL; granting Respondent's 76 Motion for Extension of Time to file a response to Petitioner's motion; and directing that his response is due September 26, 2016. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 8/25/2016. (jah)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER that Petitioner Reinaldo Javier Rivera's 56 Motion for Discovery and 57 Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing are hereby denied. Following briefing on the merits of Mr. Rivera's claim, Mr. Rivera may renew his Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing, if appropriate. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 06/10/2015. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reinaldo Javier Rivera
Represented By: Steven L. Beauvais
Represented By: Brian S. Kammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carl Humphrey
Represented By: Sabrina D. Graham
Represented By: Dana Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?