Jacobs v. Brown et al

Plaintiff: Pamela F. Jacobs
Defendant: Michael Faron Brown, Renovo Services, LLC, Renaissance Recovery Solutions, LLC and Nuvell National Auto Finance, LLC
Third_party_plaintiff: Nuvell National Auto Finance, LLC, Renaissance Recovery Solutions, LLC, United States Fire Insurance Company and Interstate Fire and Casualty Company
Third_party_defendant: Renaissance Recovery Solutions, LLC, Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company and FCCI Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2014cv00102
Filed: April 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Directing the Clerk to Enter Judgment against Defendant Monroe in favor of Plaintiff Interstate Fire & Casualty Co. in the amount of $632,198.53. The Clerk is further directed to terminate all deadlines and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 3/15/2018. (pts)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion for Summary Judgment and 76 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court Orders the parties to submit to the Court, within 14 days of this Order, a joint proposed judgment. The Court also, instructs the parties to notify the Court of any additional issues outstanding. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/12/2017. (thb)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part 42 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying with the right to re-file 43 Motion for Summary Judgment concerning the priority of coverage and al location of defense and indemnity costs between the insurers; denying as moot 60 MOTION to Strike. The parties may file renewed motions for summary judgment concerning these issues within sixty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/13/2016. (thb) Modified on 7/13/2016 (thb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela F. Jacobs
Represented By: N. Kenneth Daniel
Represented By: Raymond J. Doumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Faron Brown
Represented By: F. Michael Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renovo Services, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Collings Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renaissance Recovery Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Collings Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuvell National Auto Finance, LLC
Represented By: John G. McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_plaintiff: Nuvell National Auto Finance, LLC
Represented By: John G. McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_plaintiff: Renaissance Recovery Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Collings Patel
Represented By: F. Michael Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_plaintiff: United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie Collings Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_plaintiff: Interstate Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Stephanie Collings Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Renaissance Recovery Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Collings Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie F. Glickauf
Represented By: Stephanie F. Glickauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: FCCI Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie F. Glickauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?