Robinson v. Deal et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Robinson
Defendant: Homer Bryson and FNU Wilkes
Case Number: 1:2017cv00051
Filed: April 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING 23 Report and Recommendations and Denying as Moot 12 Motion for Permanent Injunction filed by Antonio Robinson, 10 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Antonio Robinson. This case stands CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/28/2017. (pts)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 11 Motion for Discovery; denying 13 Motion to Produce and DIRECTING Plaintiff's custodian or designee to set aside twenty percent of all deposits to Plaintiff's trust account as described herein for the payment of the filing fee for Civil Action No. 117-051. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/07/2017. (pts)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 15 Motion for Leave to Appeal; denying 17 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 06/30/2017. (pts)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Deal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homer Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?