Resolute FP Augusta, LLC v. SFC Contract Services of Georgia, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Resolute FP Augusta, LLC
Defendant: SFC Contract Services of Georgia, LLC and All-Safe Industrial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00147
Filed: November 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: Richmond
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER finding the 76 Stipulation of Dismissal proper under the Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and (c). Ordered that Plaintiff's 1 Complaint and Defendant All-Safe Industrial Services, Inc.'s 13 Counterclaim are dismissed with prejudice. All motions and deadlines are terminated, and this case stands closed. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/19/2018. (jlh)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER regarding the in camera review of Plaintiff's 40 Response (containing interview notes). The Court could not find instances when the interview notes provided answers to questions the interviewees could not answer at their depositions; therefore, Plaintiff shall not be required to produce the interview notes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/18/2018. (jlh)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Consent Motion For In Camera Review. The Court orders Plaintiff to file the previously identified documents under seal for the Court's review within 7 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/15/2018. (jlh)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 33 MOTION for Discovery to Conduct Destructive Testing subject to conditions as outlined in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/18/2018. (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Resolute FP Augusta, LLC v. SFC Contract Services of Georgia, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resolute FP Augusta, LLC
Represented By: William M. Droze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFC Contract Services of Georgia, LLC
Represented By: Ian R. Rapaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All-Safe Industrial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Hugh Peterson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?