GJ&L, Inc. v. CNH Industrial America, LLC

Plaintiff: GJ&L, Inc.
Defendant: CNH Industrial America, LLC
Counter_claimant: CNH Industrial America, LLC
Counter_defendant: GJ&L, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00179
Filed: December 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: Richmond
Referring Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying 51 Motion for Certificate of Appealability of Summary Judgment Order. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 08/06/2018. (jlh)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 17 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 7/9/2018. (pts)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting Defendant's 30 Motion to Withdraw its 22 Motion; and terminating 22 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 06/13/2018. (jlh)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 Motion to Stay, and discovery is stayed through and including 06/30/2018 pending the parties' scheduled mediation on 06/22/2018. If mediation is unsuccessful then the Rule 26(f) Report is due no later than 07/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/01/2018. (jlh)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge J. Randal Hall recused. Case reassigned to Judge Dudley H. Bowen for all further plenary proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 05/21/2018. (jlh)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 40 Consent Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 04/23/2018. (jlh)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice re Brannon J. Arnold. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/17/2018. (jlh)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 33 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice re William C. Buhay. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/16/2018. (jlh)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Seal Documents Exhibits A and B of 14 Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 02/13/2018. (jlh)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 4 and 6 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 01/04/2018. (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GJ&L, Inc. v. CNH Industrial America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GJ&L, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Cosper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH Industrial America, LLC
Represented By: Brannon J. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: CNH Industrial America, LLC
Represented By: Brannon J. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: GJ&L, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Cosper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?