Prince v. Shepard, et al.

Plaintiff: Joseph Tiger D. Prince
Defendant: Elizabeth Roberts, V. Brown, Knight, Stroup and Jaqulyn Champion
Case Number: 1:2018cv00011
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Augusta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Stay Discovery; granting in part 37 Motion for Leave of Court to File Expanded Document. The Court STAYS Discovery in this action pending final resolution of Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/11/2018. (maa)
March 30, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 25 Report and Recommendations, DENYING 22 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief and 23 Motion for Hearing, Motion for TRO. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/30/2018. (maa)
March 7, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 Report and Recommendations, DENYING 21 Motion to Amend/Correct, and DISMISSING Defendants Champion, Brown, and Roberts from this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/07/2018. (maa)
January 11, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court approves and adopts the 11 Report and Recommendation as the judgment of the Court. The action is DISMISSED as to the Defendant Shepard. The case is TRANSFERRED to the Augusta Division of the Southern District of Georgia. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/11/18. (bnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince v. Shepard, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Tiger D. Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stroup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaqulyn Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?