Israel v. United States Of America

Plaintiff: Dory Israel
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv00126
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Augusta Office
County: Richmond
0 Judge: Brian K Epps
1 Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave of Absence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/3/2018. (cjc)
October 3, 2018 MOTION REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to United States Of America for dates of : October 5 through October 17, 2018. (thb)
October 3, 2018 7 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to United States Of America for dates of : October 5 through October 17, 2018 by United States Of America. Responses due by 10/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patrick, Bradford)
October 3, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford Collins Patrick on behalf of United States Of America (Patrick, Bradford)
September 4, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Epstein on behalf of Dory Israel (Epstein, Daniel)
August 13, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to United States Of America, U.S. Attorney. (pts)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms) (pts)
August 13, 2018 2 Summons Submitted (Dolder, Richard)
August 13, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2428697. (pts)
August 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against United States Of America, filed by Dory Israel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Israel v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dory Israel
Represented By: Richard E. Dolder
Represented By: Daniel M. Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?