Wisser v. Morris Communications Company, LLC

Plaintiff: Bill Wisser
Defendant: Morris Communications Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00150
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
0 Judge: Brian K Epps
1 Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Compliance re #16 due by 9/21/2018. (pts)
September 11, 2018 16 NOTICE to Counsel of Record re: Attorney Appearance. (pts)
September 11, 2018 15 NOTICE to All Counsel of Record of Transfer of case. (pts)
September 11, 2018 14 Case transfer in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-05262. Case transferred electronically
September 4, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Southern District of Georgia (cf)
September 4, 2018 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter filed by Bill Wisser. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the U.S District Court the Southern District of Georgia. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/4/2018) (cf)
September 3, 2018 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Richard Liebowitz dated September 3, 2018 re: Voluntary Transfer to Southern District of Georgia. Document filed by Bill Wisser.(Liebowitz, Richard)
August 28, 2018 11 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #1 Complaint , Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Glenn Greenberg dated August 28, 2018. Document filed by Morris Communications Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Terry K. House, Jr.)(Greenberg, Glenn)
August 13, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Application is granted. Morris Communications Company, LLC answer due 8/30/2018 (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/10/2018) (cf)
August 9, 2018 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Richard Liebowitz dated August 9, 2018. Document filed by Bill Wisser.(Liebowitz, Richard)
July 30, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Application is granted. Morris Communications Company, LLC answer due 8/10/2018 (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/30/2018) (cf)
July 26, 2018 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Richard Liebowitz dated July 26, 2018. Document filed by Bill Wisser.(Liebowitz, Richard)
June 26, 2018 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Morris Communications Company, LLC served on 6/14/2018, answer due 7/5/2018. Document filed by Bill Wisser. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
June 13, 2018 5 Featured Case NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/18/2018 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/13/2018) (cf)
June 12, 2018 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 12, 2018 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Morris Communications Company, LLC. (jgo)
June 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 12, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 12, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
June 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
June 11, 2018 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Morris Communications Company, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bill Wisser. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Morris Communications Company, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15185455)Document filed by Bill Wisser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisser v. Morris Communications Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Communications Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Wisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?