Lucky 7 of GA., LLC v. Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lucky 7 of GA., LLC
Defendant: Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00160
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/10/2018. Discovery due by 3/11/2019. Motions due by 4/10/2019. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 12/28/2018. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 1/24/2019. Status Report due by 3/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/12/2018. (maa)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kelly, Scott)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott W. Kelly on behalf of Lucky 7 of GA., LLC (Kelly, Scott)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 Removal NOTICE to All Counsel of Record. (pts)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Forms) (pts)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc. (pts)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc. (pts)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc. from Superior Court of Richmond County, case number 2018RCCV00437. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2449855) (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Answer, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucky 7 of GA., LLC v. Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald R. Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucky 7 of GA., LLC
Represented By: Scott W. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?