Rowe v. Ferdianad et al

Plaintiff: George Homer Rowe, Jr.
Defendant: Dr. Ferdianad and Augusta University Hospital
Case Number: 1:2018cv00171
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
0 Judge: Brian K Epps
1 Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER directing service of the #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/26/2018. (thb)
November 26, 2018 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint, that this case be dismissed without prejudice and that this civil action be closed. Objections to R&R due by 12/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/26/2018. (thb)
October 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 11/11/2018. (maa)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must return both the Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk within thirty days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/12/2018. (maa)
October 5, 2018 3 Inmate Account Statement by George Homer Rowe, Jr. (jrb)
October 5, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by George Homer Rowe, Jr. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(jrb)
October 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by George Homer Rowe, Jr.(jrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowe v. Ferdianad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ferdianad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augusta University Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Homer Rowe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?