Thomas v. Department of the Treasury et al

Defendant: Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service and Carrie Samuels
Petitioner: Stacey Thomas
Case Number: 1:2018cv00209
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 Stay lifted due to appropriations. (See MC 119-002, Docs. 1, 3.) Response to the #6 Motion filed on December 12, 2018 is due on January 31, 2019. Replies are due 14 days after the response is filed. (jlh)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Staying Civil Proceedings in Light of Lapse in Appropriations. Signed by the Judges of the Southern District of Georgia on 1/11/2019. (thb)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay. This case is hereby STAYED until the DOJ's funding is restored, and all pending deadlines in this matter are extended for the same number of days as the DOJ's lapse in funding. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/26/2018. (jlh)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay (due to lapse in appropriations) by Internal Revenue Service. Responses due by 1/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Statkus, Shannon)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Carrie Samuels. (Wills, Charles) Modified on 12/13/2018 (jlh).
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service by Carrie Samuels.(Wills, Charles)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Deposit Funds Payment of Reasonable Cost and Fees and Dismissal from Case by Stacey Thomas. Responses due by 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit For Attorneys' Fees)(Dunaway, Davis)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Davis A. Dunaway on behalf of Stacey Thomas (Dunaway, Davis)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles W. Wills on behalf of Carrie Samuels.(Wills, Charles) Modified on 12/7/2018 (jlh).
December 6, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #2 Notice due by 12/14/2018. (jlh)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms) (pts)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 REMOVAL NOTICE to All Counsel of Record. (pts)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Superior Court of McDuffie County, Georgia, case number 18CV00402, filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Petition, #2 Response filed in Superior Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts) Modified on 12/6/2018 (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Department of the Treasury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stacey Thomas
Represented By: Davis A. Dunaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Samuels
Represented By: Jason W. Blanchard
Represented By: Charles W. Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?