United States of America, for the Use and Benefit of Dixie Communications Systems, Inc. et al v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Dixie Communications Systems, Inc. and United States of America, for the Use and Benefit of Dixie Communications Systems, Inc.
Defendant: ICON Construction, Inc., J&J Maintenance, Inc., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, . and Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv00210
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America, for the Use and Benefit of Dixie Communications Systems, Inc.. ICON Construction, Inc. served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Tarver, Edward)
February 1, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by J&J Maintenance, Inc.. (Huff, Joseph)
January 31, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Intent To File Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America. (Egan, M.)
January 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss by J&J Maintenance, Inc. re #12 Response to Motion. (Huff, Joseph)
January 30, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by United States of America, for the Use and Benefit of Dixie Communications Systems, Inc. (Tarver, Edward)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by United States of America, for the Use and Benefit of Dixie Communications Systems, Inc.. (Tarver, Edward)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America identifying Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America as Corporate Parent.. (Egan, M.)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Dixie Communications Systems, Inc. (Tarver, Edward) Modified on 1/18/2019 (jlh).
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America to Dixie Communications Systems, Inc.'s Complaint by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Egan, M.)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Responses due by 1/31/2019. (Egan, M.)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's Extension ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America answer due 1/18/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/9/2019. (pts)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Responses due by 1/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Egan, M.)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J&J Maintenance, Inc. (Huff, Joseph) Modified on 1/7/2019 (pts).
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support Thereof by J&J Maintenance, Inc. Responses due by 1/18/2019. (Huff, Joseph) Modified on 1/7/2019 (pts).
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dixie Communications Systems, Inc. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Tarver, Edward) Modified on 12/28/2018 (jlh).
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dixie Communications Systems, Inc. J&J Maintenance, Inc. served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Tarver, Edward) Modified on 12/28/2018 (jlh).
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms) (pts)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (pts)
December 5, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2494772. (pts)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dixie Communications Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America, for the Use and Benefit of Dixie Communications Systems, Inc. et al v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dixie Communications Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, for the Use and Benefit of Dixie Communications Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICON Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&J Maintenance, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph H. Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, .
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America
Represented By: M. Michael Egan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?