Reese et al v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jessica Reese, Leonard Marshall and Randy Reese
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00215
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave of Absence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 1/23/2019. (cjc)
January 23, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 First MOTION for Leave of Absence as to CSX Transportation, Inc. for dates of: 03/01/19, 05/08-13/19, 06/6-10/19, 06/12-17/19. (jlh)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Leave of Absence as to CSX Transportation, Inc. for dates of: 03/01/19, 05/08-13/19, 06/6-10/19, 06/12-17/19 by CSX Transportation, Inc. Responses due by 2/6/2019. (Purcell, James) Modified on 1/23/2019 (jlh).
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave of Absence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 1/15/2019. (cjc)
January 14, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Leonard Marshall, Jessica Reese, Randy Reese for dates of : February 5, 6, 18, 19, 20, 21 and 22, 2019. (jlh) Modified on 1/14/2019 (jlh).
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Leonard Marshall, Jessica Reese, Randy Reese for dates of : February 5, 6, 18, 19, 20, 21 and 22, 2019 by Leonard Marshall, Jessica Reese, Randy Reese. Responses due by 1/28/2019. (Shelton, Martin) Modified on 1/14/2019 (jlh).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/16/2019; Discovery due by 7/17/2019; Motions due by 8/16/2019; Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 5/16/2019; Expert Witness Report (Defendant) due by 6/17/2019; and Joint Status Report due by 7/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/11/2019. (jlh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Purcell, James)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Leonard Marshall, Jessica Reese, Randy Reese. (Shelton, Martin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Leonard Marshall, Jessica Reese, Randy Reese. (Shelton, Martin)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 Litigants' Bill of Rights by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Purcell, James) Modified on 12/20/2018 (jlh).
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Purcell, James) Modified on 12/20/2018 (jlh).
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Purcell, James) Modified on 12/20/2018 (jlh).
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Arthur Shelton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shelton, Martin)
December 14, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: CSX Transportation, Inc. answer due 12/21/2018. (jlh)
December 14, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #3 Notice due by 12/24/2018. (jlh)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 REMOVAL NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. (jlh)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CSX Transportation, Inc. from Superior Court of Columbia County, Georgia, case number 2018ECV0368, filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113J-2501727.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Service of Process, Summons, and Complaint; and #2 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese et al v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Reese
Represented By: Martin Arthur Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Marshall
Represented By: Martin Arthur Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Reese
Represented By: Martin Arthur Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: James W. Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?