Love v. Wells Fargo, NA
Plaintiff: Antjuan Love
Defendant: Wells Fargo, NA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00003
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing service of #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 2/22/2019. (maa)
February 22, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the #1 Complaint filed by Antjuan Love be DISMISSED without prejudice, the #10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED AS MOOT, and this civil action be CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 3/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/22/2019. (maa)
February 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 2/19/2019. (maa)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Plaintiff has through and including February 19, 2019 to file his amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/07/2019. (maa)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint by Antjuan Love. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(jlh)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Antjuan Love. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Antjuan Love. (jlh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Antjuan Love. (jlh)
January 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 1/24/2019. (maa)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to file the Disclosure Statement required by Local Rule 7.1.1. The request for an extension of time related to the Rule 26 Instruction Order is MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/23/2019. (maa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1), by Antjuan Love. Responses due by 2/5/2019. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(jlh)
January 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: IFP Motion due by 2/7/2019. (jlh)
January 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 2/7/2019. Motion for IFP due by 2/7/2019. (thb) Modified on 1/17/2019 (jlh).
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court directs Plaintiff to submit a new motion to proceed IFP within twenty-one days of the date of this Order. The Court also Orders Plaintiff to amend his complaint to include all of his allegations in one document within twenty-one days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Long Form, and #2 Complaint for a Civil Case Form.) (jlh)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/08/2019. (maa)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Receipt of Instructions by Antjuan Love. (maa)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antjuan Love. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(maa)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo, NA, filed by Antjuan Love.(maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. Wells Fargo, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antjuan Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?