Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company v. Carolina Piping Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Lindsey Meagher, Anita Wylds, Henry Wylds, Mary M. Meagher, Emma G. Meagher and Carolina Piping Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00023
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Emma G. Meagher, Lindsey Meagher, Mary M. Meagher.(Hawk, Victor)
April 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Carolina Piping Services, Inc. answer due 5/18/2019. (maa)
April 2, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. Carolina Piping Services, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2019, answer due 5/27/2019. (Benjamin, Vonnetta)
March 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Emma G. Meagher answer due 4/5/2019; Mary M. Meagher answer due 4/5/2019. (maa)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed March 15, 2019, for Mary M. Meagher Acknowledgement filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benjamin, Vonnetta)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed March 15, 2019, for Emma G. Meagher Acknowledgement filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benjamin, Vonnetta)
March 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Lindsey Meagher answer due 3/25/2019. (maa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed 3/4/2019 Acknowledgement filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benjamin, Vonnetta)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Anita Wylds, Henry Wylds. (Revell, Harry)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Anita Wylds, Henry Wylds. (Revell, Harry)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Anita Wylds, Henry Wylds.(Revell, Harry)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. Henry Wylds served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Benjamin, Vonnetta)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. Anita Wylds served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Benjamin, Vonnetta)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benjamin, Vonnetta)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benjamin, Vonnetta)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carolina Piping Services, Inc., Emma G. Meagher, Lindsey Meagher, Mary M. Meagher, Anita Wylds, and Henry Wylds. (jlh)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
February 14, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2541691. (jlh)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against all Defendants, filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint from Superior Court of Richmond County, GA (2017RCCV00492), #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint from Richmond County, GA (2017RCSC1497), #3 Exhibit C - Endurance Insurance Policy, and #4 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company v. Carolina Piping Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Meagher
Represented By: Victor Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Wylds
Represented By: Harry D. Revell
Represented By: Adam William King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Wylds
Represented By: Harry D. Revell
Represented By: Adam William King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary M. Meagher
Represented By: Victor Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emma G. Meagher
Represented By: Victor Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Piping Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Vonnetta L. Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?