Westinghouse Electric Company LLC et al v. Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: AZZ, Inc. and The Calvert Company, Inc.
Defendant: WECTEC Global Project Services, Inc., Georgia Power Company, Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia, the City of Dalton, Georgia, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Wectel Global Project Services, Inc. and Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc.
In Re: Westinghouse Electric Company LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00052
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SCHEDULING ORDER:Fact Discovery due by 1/16/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 6/5/2019. Joint Status Report on Remedial Work and Remedial Expenses due by 10/16/2019. Motions due by 6/17/2020. Affirmative Expert Witness Report due by 1/16/2020. Affirmative Expert Witness Depositions due by 03/16/2020. Rebuttal Expert Witness Report due by 3/30/2020. Rebuttal Expert Witness Depositions due by 5/18/2020. Expert Discovery 5/18/2020. Status Report due by 5/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 5/17/2019. (pts) Modified on 5/22/2019 (pts).
May 16, 2019 Filing 45 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by AZZ, Inc.. (Reams, Stephen)
May 16, 2019 Filing 44 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Reams, Stephen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin H. Brewton on behalf of Georgia Power Company, Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., the City of Dalton, Georgia (Brewton, Benjamin)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER vacating #41 Order. The Rule 26(f) Report shall be filed no later than May 20, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/10/2019. (jlh)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 (VACATED. See #42 Order.)ORDER directing parties to conduct a conference within fourteen days of the date of this Order and to file a joint 26(f) report within seven days of the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) Report Form.) (jlh) Modified on 5/10/2019 (jlh).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 5/9/2019. (cjc)
May 9, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (pts)
May 9, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2598597, Fee Amount $200, by AZZ, Inc.. Responses due by 5/23/2019. (Reams, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2019: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (pts).
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Amend/Correct Name of Defendant WECTEC Global Project Services, Inc. n/k/a Stone & Webster, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 5/3/2019. (pts)
May 2, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C. Staak on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Staak, Joseph)
May 1, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Reams on behalf of AZZ, Inc., The Calvert Company, Inc. (Reams, Stephen)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER finding as moot #27 Motion to Substitute Attorney; granting #34 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys John Thaddeus Dorsey, Edwin J. Harron, Edward Soto, Robert S. Berezin, and Garrett A. Fail terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 5/1/2019. (pts)
April 22, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #33 MOTION to Amend/Correct name of Defendant. (pts)
April 22, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Substitution of Counsel by WECTEC Global Project Services, Inc.. Responses due by 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Substitution of Counsel for Defendant)(Weston, James)
April 22, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Amend/Correct name of Defendant by WECTEC Global Project Services, Inc.. Responses due by 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Correct Name of Defendant)(Weston, James)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall have through and including May 6, 2019, to hold the Rule 26(f) conference. The 26(f) Report shall be filed no later than May 20, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/19/2019. (pts)
April 19, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold 26(f) Conference to May 6, 2019 . (pts)
April 19, 2019 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold 26(f) Conference to May 6, 2019 , by Georgia Power Company, Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., the City of Dalton, Georgia. Responses due by 5/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gram, Brooke)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave of Absence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/16/2019. (cjc)
April 16, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #29 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Georgia Power Company, Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., the City of Dalton, Georgia. (pts)
April 16, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Georgia Power Company, Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., the City of Dalton, Georgia by Georgia Power Company, Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., the City of Dalton, Georgia. Responses due by 4/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gram, Brooke)
April 10, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Intent to file by WECTEC Global Project Services, Inc. re #27 Proposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney . (Weston, James)
April 8, 2019 Filing 27 Proposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by WECTEC Global Project Services, Inc. Responses due by 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Substitution of Counsel)(Weston, James) Modified on 4/9/2019 (thb).
April 8, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by WECTEC Global Project Services, Inc. Substitution of Counsel (Weston, James)
April 5, 2019 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Georgia Power Company, Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., the City of Dalton, Georgia. (Gram, Brooke)
April 2, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Finley on behalf of Georgia Power Company, Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., the City of Dalton, Georgia (Finley, Joseph)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RULE 26(f) Instruction ORDER for Transferred Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/2/2019. (pts) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2019: #1 Blank Forms) (pts).
April 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke Walker. Gram on behalf of Georgia Power Company, Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., the City of Dalton, Georgia (Gram, Brooke)
April 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Joshua Archer on behalf of Georgia Power Company, Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., the City of Dalton, Georgia (Archer, T.)
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE to All Counsel of Record of Case Transfer. (pts)
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 Case transfer in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-03942. Case transferred electronically
March 25, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Southern District of Georgia (jwh)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION & ORDER re: #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia; #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to withdraw the bankruptcy reference as to the Vogtle Claims and the Vogtle Counterclaims, (Doc. 1), is GRANTED. Defendants' motion to transfer those claims to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, (Doc. 7), is also GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the open motions at Documents 1 and 7 and to transfer the Vogtle ClaimsCounts I, II, V, and VIas well as the Vogtle Counterclaims, in the adversary proceeding, No. 18-1016, to the Southern District of Georgia. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/25/2019) (jwh) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
July 16, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. . Document filed by Georgia Power Company, Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., The City of Dalton Georgia, WECTEC Global Project Services, Inc.. (Kordas, Anna)
June 27, 2018 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Scott M. Kessler, Esq. dated June 27, 2018 re: requesting Oral Argument in connection with Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Document filed by AZZ, Inc., The Calvert Company, Inc..(Kessler, Scott)
June 27, 2018 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Bob Stephenson in Opposition re: #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia.. Document filed by AZZ, Inc., The Calvert Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Kessler, Scott)
June 5, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 18-1016A, 17-B-10751 (MEW). . Document filed by Georgia Power Company, Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., The City of Dalton Georgia, WECTEC Global Project Services, Inc.. (Kordas, Anna)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #10 Letter, filed by The Calvert Company, Inc., AZZ, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #10 Letter, #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. (Responses due by 6/27/2018, Replies due by 7/16/2018.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/31/2018) (rro)
May 29, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 18-1016A, 17-B-10751 (MEW). . Document filed by AZZ, Inc., The Calvert Company, Inc.. (Balaschak, Susan)
May 29, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Scott M. Kessler, Esq. dated May 29, 2018 re: Plaintiffs' and Defendants' agreement to set a briefing schedule on the Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Document filed by AZZ, Inc., The Calvert Company, Inc..(Kessler, Scott)
May 22, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. . Document filed by Georgia Power Company, Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., The City of Dalton Georgia. (Kordas, Anna)
May 22, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Anna Kordas in Support re: #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia.. Document filed by Georgia Power Company, Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., The City of Dalton Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of potential witnesses, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Thomas Saunders, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint No. 18-01016, #4 Exhibit D - Stipulation, #5 Exhibit E - Answer and Counterclaims)(Kordas, Anna)
May 22, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Document filed by Georgia Power Company, Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., The City of Dalton Georgia.(Kordas, Anna)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION EXTENDING PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF THE REFERENCE OF CERTAIN CLAIMS IN THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, as follows: The deadline for the Plaintiffs to file a response to the Motion is extended until on or before May 29, 2018, without prejudice to the right of the Plaintiffs to seek further extensions of the deadline and the right of the Defendants to oppose such a request; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 5/29/2018.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/17/2018) (anc)
May 16, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion for Withdrawal of the Reference of Certain Claims in the Adversary Proceeding by Stipulation. Document filed by AZZ, Inc., The Calvert Company, Inc..(Balaschak, Susan) Modified on 5/24/2018 (db).
May 4, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Southern Company for Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc.. Document filed by Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc..(Kordas, Anna)
May 4, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Southern Company for Georgia Power Company. Document filed by Georgia Power Company.(Kordas, Anna)
May 2, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (bkar)
May 2, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bkar)
May 2, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar)
May 2, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 18-1016A, 17-B-10751 (MEW).Document filed by Georgia Power Company, Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., The City of Dalton Georgia, Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia, Oglethorpe Power Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westinghouse Electric Company LLC et al v. Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Westinghouse Electric Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WECTEC Global Project Services, Inc.
Represented By: John Thaddeus Dorsey
Represented By: James S.V. Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Power Company
Represented By: T. Joshua Archer
Represented By: Brooke Walker. Gram
Represented By: Anna Kordas
Represented By: Joseph E. Finley
Represented By: Benjamin H. Brewton
Represented By: Brooke Walker Gram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia
Represented By: T. Joshua Archer
Represented By: Brooke Walker. Gram
Represented By: Anna Kordas
Represented By: Joseph E. Finley
Represented By: Benjamin H. Brewton
Represented By: Brooke Walker Gram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: the City of Dalton, Georgia
Represented By: T. Joshua Archer
Represented By: Brooke Walker. Gram
Represented By: Anna Kordas
Represented By: Joseph E. Finley
Represented By: Benjamin H. Brewton
Represented By: Brooke Walker Gram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oglethorpe Power Corporation
Represented By: T. Joshua Archer
Represented By: Brooke Walker. Gram
Represented By: Anna Kordas
Represented By: Joseph E. Finley
Represented By: Benjamin H. Brewton
Represented By: Brooke Walker Gram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wectel Global Project Services, Inc.
Represented By: John Thaddeus Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc.
Represented By: T. Joshua Archer
Represented By: Brooke Walker. Gram
Represented By: Anna Kordas
Represented By: Joseph E. Finley
Represented By: Benjamin H. Brewton
Represented By: Brooke Walker Gram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AZZ, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Michael Kessler
Represented By: Susan Florence Balaschak
Represented By: Mary Katherine Fackler
Represented By: Joseph C. Staak
Represented By: Stephen M. Reams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Calvert Company, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Michael Kessler
Represented By: Susan Florence Balaschak
Represented By: Mary Katherine Fackler
Represented By: Joseph C. Staak
Represented By: Stephen M. Reams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?