Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Jarmon et al
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC and Fort Gordon Housing, LLC doing business as Balfour Beatty Communities
Defendant: Yolanda Jarmon, Sarita Jarmon and Lyle Jarmon
Case Number: 1:2019cv00071
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1443(1) Rent, Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees except as otherwise agreed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 06/11/2019. (maa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC (Hamilton, Daniel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. Yolanda Jarmon served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Hamilton, Daniel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. Sarita Jarmon served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Hamilton, Daniel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. Lyle Jarmon served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Hamilton, Daniel)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to all Defendants. (jlh)
May 15, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2604040. (jlh)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Resident Responsibility Agreement, #2 Exhibit - Notice to Cure Default, #3 Exhibit - Ledger, and #4 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Jarmon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Jarmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarita Jarmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyle Jarmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC doing business as Balfour Beatty Communities
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?