Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Snell et al
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC and Fort Gordon Housing, LLC doing business as Balfour Beatty Communities
Defendant: Jennifer Snell and Joshua Snell
Case Number: 1:2019cv00072
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. Jennifer Snell served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Hamilton, Daniel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. Joshua Snell served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Hamilton, Daniel)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank forms for new civil case filings) (thb)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jennifer Snell, Joshua Snell. (thb)
May 15, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2604041. (thb)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jennifer Snell, Joshua Snell, filed by Fort Gordon Housing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Lease Agreement Renewal, #2 Exhibit - Notice to Cure Default and Demand Possession, #3 Exhibit - Ledger, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(thb) Modified on 5/16/2019 (thb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC v. Snell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Gordon Housing, LLC doing business as Balfour Beatty Communities
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?